Rivera-Percy et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | William G Young |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-03107 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 06, 2017 5:34 AM AST |
Defendant
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Correction and Rehabilitation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jose O Ortiz-Rios
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jose U Zayas-Cintron
|
|
Plaintiff
CAR-N
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arlene Nieves-Pagan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jayce A Rivera-Nieves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor T Rivera-Percy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Informative Motion
Wed 09/13 3:50 PM
ORDER noted28 INFORMATIVE motion. "The Court acknowledges the filing of these materials." Signed by Judge William G Young on 9/13/2017. (EES) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Informative Motion
Fri 08/25 4:45 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding 2nd Amended Notice of PROMESA Procedures, filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios Responses due by 9/8/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez Castaner, Rafael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/10 1:55 PM
ORDER finding as moot23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . "Motion denied as moot." Signed by Judge William G Young on 7/10/2017. (EES) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order
Mon 07/10 1:51 PM
ORDER re24 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jayce A Rivera-Nieves, Arlene Nieves-Pagan, CAR-N, Victor T Rivera-Percy, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves "As it must, this Court conforms to the provisions of PROMESA which include an automatic stay of litigation against the Commonwealth which seek payment. Accordingly, this case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened upon motion of any party should the stay be lifted or should the bankruptcy proceedings conclude, whichever shall first occur." Signed by Judge William G Young on 7/10/2017.(EES) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Informative Motion Requesting Order
Wed 07/05 5:44 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding counsel out of the jurisdiction, MOTION requesting Order filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/19/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
Tuesday, July 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 07/04 4:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re:13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/03 4:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/5/2017 to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/3/2017 to File Response/Reply as to 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Jayce A Rivera-Nieves, Arlene Nieves-Pagan, CAR-N, Victor T Rivera-Percy, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/17/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/28 3:54 PM
Interim NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice against co-defendant Jos U. Zayas Cintrn by CAR-N, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves, Arlene Nieves-Pagan, Jayce A Rivera-Nieves, Victor T Rivera-Percy (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/23 7:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/3/2017 to File Response/Reply as to 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order Cancelling Deadline
Fri 06/23 9:26 AM
ORDER Cancelling Deadline. The motion hearing set for July 14, 2017 is hereby canceled. See Order 19 entered this date. Signed by Judge William G Young on June 23, 2017.(jg) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 06/23 9:20 AM
ORDER denying18 Motion to Continue. "Motion denied. The oral hearing is cancelled and the matter will be submitted on the papers." Signed by Judge William G Young on 6/23/2017. (EES) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue
Thu 06/22 1:18 PM
MOTION to Continue Hearing Set for July 14, 2017 filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 7/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/22 9:36 AM
ORDER re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico,15 MOTION to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m) as to Jose U Zayas-Cintron filed by Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,15 MOTION to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m) as to Jose U Zayas-Cintron : Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 before Judge William G Young by video conference. Signed by Judge William G Young on June 22, 2017.(jg) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/15 3:56 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/25/2017 to File Response/Reply "Allowed upon the representation that plaintiff's counsel is serving on active duty."Signed by Judge William G Young on 5/15/2017. (EES) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss
Fri 05/12 12:31 PM
MOTION to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m) as to Jose U Zayas-Cintron filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios Responses due by 5/26/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael) |
|
Saturday, April 29, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Requesting Order
Sat 04/29 1:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/25/2017 to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, MOTION requesting Order filed by Juan Ramon Rodriguez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 5/15/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 04/26 7:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios Responses due by 5/10/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/13 1:53 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer"Motion Allowed. There shall be no further continuance." Answer deadline due by 4/26/2017. Signed by Judge William G Young on 4/13/2017. (EES) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Appear Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 03/29 10:11 AM
ORDER finding as moot4 Motion for extension of time until 3/9/2017 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez THIRD MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2017 to File Answer has been filed. See docket entry 8 . Signed by Judge William G Young on 3/29/2017. (jg) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 03/29 10:07 AM
ORDER finding as moot7 Motion for Extension of Time until March 27, 2017 to Answer re1 Complaint, filed by Jayce A Rivera-Nieves, Arlene Nieves-Pagan, CAR-N, Victor T Rivera-Percy, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves Signed by Judge William G Young on 3/29/2017. (jg) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 03/29 10:06 AM
ORDER finding as moot6 Motion for extension of time until 3/25/2017 to to answer or otherwise plead filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Jose O Ortiz-Rios Signed by Judge William G Young on 3/28/2017. (jg) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 03/27 5:15 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2017 to File Answer answer to the complaint or otherwise plead re:1 Complaint, filed by Jayce A Rivera-Nieves, Arlene Nieves-Pagan, CAR-N, Victor T Rivera-Percy, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves filed by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios Responses due by 4/10/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/09 5:06 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until March 27, 2017 to File Answer to the complaint or otherwise plead re:1 Complaint, filed by Jayce A Rivera-Nieves, Arlene Nieves-Pagan, CAR-N, Victor T Rivera-Percy, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves filed by Yadhira Ramirez-Toro on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez Responses due by 3/23/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Toro, Yadhira) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 02/22 12:36 PM
MOTION for extension of time until 3/25/2017 to to answer or otherwise plead filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Jose O Ortiz-Rios Responses due by 3/8/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/07 4:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Jose O Ortiz-Rios served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017. (Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Extension of Time
Fri 02/03 5:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear (Special Appearance) , MOTION for extension of time until 3/9/2017 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Rafael B. Fernandez Castaner on behalf of Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez Responses due by 2/17/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez Castaner, Rafael) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/09 2:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Department of Correction and Rehabilitation, Cesar R. Miranda-Rodriguez, Jose O Ortiz-Rios, Jose U Zayas-Cintron (arg) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 12/09 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G Young (arg) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/08 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5215191.), filed by CAR-N, Arlene Nieves-Pagan, Jayce A Rivera-Nieves, Victor T Rivera-Percy, Conjugal Partnership Rivera-Nieves. Service due by 3/13/2017,(Rodriguez-Lopez, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons |