Exxon Mobil Corporation v. Pawa Law Group, P.C. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | William G Young |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-12504 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 23, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2017 4:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Maura T. Healey
|
|
Defendant
Eric Schneiderman
|
|
Movant
Matthew Pawa
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Pawa Law Group, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Exxon Mobil Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 06/27 10:15 AM
Judge William G. Young ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: re39 MOTION to Dismiss for Mootness. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Dismiss
Wed 03/22 2:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for mootness by Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Pawa, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff
Tue 01/17 3:39 PM
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Transcript and notice docket entries were deleted because they were inadvertently docketed to incorrect case by court staff. (Scalfani, Deborah) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Tue 01/17 3:25 PM
NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm] (Scalfani, Deborah) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Transcript
Tue 01/17 3:25 PM
Transcript of Motion to Quash Subpoena Hearing held on December 16, 2016, before Judge William G. Young. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com Redaction Request due 2/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Notice of Supplemental Authorities
Thu 01/12 5:23 PM
Notice of Supplemental Authorities re1 MOTION to Quash Nonparty subpoenas issued by Exxon Mobil Corporation to the Pawa Law Group PC and Attorney Matthew Pawa Filing fee: $ 46, receipt number 0101-6388388 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Rose, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Fri 12/23 10:41 AM
Judge William G. Young: ORDER Administratively closing the case entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 12/23 10:39 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2016 re1 MOTION to Quash Nonparty subpoenas issued by Exxon Mobil Corporation to the Pawa Law Group PC and Attorney Matthew Pawa Filing fee: $ 46, receipt number 0101-6388388 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) filed by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C.,15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. The Court enters an Order administratively closing the case. It may be reopened upon the filing of a motion by any party if the stay entered is lifted or the adjudication or settlement of either underlying case. (Court Reporter: Richard Romanow at bulldog@richromanow.com.)(Attorneys present: Frongillo, Anderson and Conlon for the plaintiff, Chinitz, Moriello and Rose for the defendants/interested parties) (Gaudet, Jennifer) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/16 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Moriello on behalf of Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C. (Moriello, Antonio) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter/request - non-motion
Thu 12/15 3:39 PM
Letter/request (non-motion) from Justin Anderson . (Frongillo, Thomas) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Thu 12/15 10:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Joanne Spalding in Opposition re15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel filed by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C.. (Chinitz, Michael) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 12/15 8:22 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Marco Simons. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice requesting courtesy copy
Thu 12/15 7:29 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for26 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office attention Matthew Paine Docket Clerk Judge Young. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/14 10:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Gleason in Opposition re15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel filed by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C.. (Chinitz, Michael) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/14 10:28 PM
Second AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Pawa in Opposition re15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel filed by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Chinitz, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit U, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit V, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit W, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit X | ||
25 | 25
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/14 10:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel filed by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C.. (Chinitz, Michael) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 12/14 1:00 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marco Simons Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6414812 by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Chinitz, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 12/14 10:44 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Paine, Matthew) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 12/12 4:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , not to Exceed Twenty-Five Pages, in Response to Exxon Mobil Corporation's Cross-Motion Seeking to Compel and Transfer by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Chinitz, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 12/12 2:39 PM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Catherine S. Duval. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/12 1:54 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Catherine S. Duval Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6411001 by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Chinitz, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Rule 83.5.3 Certification of Catherine S. Duval, Esq. in Support of Assented-to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice | ||
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 12/09 3:14 PM
Notice of transfer of MBD matter to civil docket. (adminn, ) |
|
18 | 18
misccs
Electronic Notice re transfer to Civil Docket
Fri 12/09 3:11 PM
Electronic notice to counsel: Contested Miscellaneous Business Docket (MBD) Number 1:16-mc-91354-WGY has been transferred to the civil docket of this Court as civil action number 1:16cv12504 and assigned to Judge Young. All further filings should be made in the new civil action. (adminn, ) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion1 MOTION to Quash Nonparty subpoenas issued by Exxon Mobil Corporation to the Pawa Law Group PC and Attorney Matthew Pawa Filing fee: $ 46, receipt number 0101-6388388 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid),15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) | |
16 | 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re1 MOTION to Quash Nonparty subpoenas issued by Exxon Mobil Corporation to the Pawa Law Group PC and Attorney Matthew Pawa and MEMORANDUM in Supoort15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Paine, Matthew) | |
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
15 | 15 Cross-MOTION to Transfer Case and to Compel filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Frongillo, Thomas) (Modified on 12/8/2016 to Correct Dockt Text and CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew). | |
Att: 1 Memorandum ISO Opposition and Cross-Motion to Transfer and to Compel, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michelle Parikh | ||
14 | 14 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Michelle Parikh, Daniel J. Toal, Theodore V. Wells Jr... Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) | |
13 | 13 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Justin Anderson, Daniel E. Bolia, Patrick J. Conlon, Michele Hirshman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Paine, Matthew) | |
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
12 | 12 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michelle Parikh, Daniel J. Toal, Theodore V. Wells Jr. Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-6403535 by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Simons, Caroline) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification for Michelle Parikh, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification for Daniel Toal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certification for Theodore Wells Jr. | ||
11 | 11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Justin Anderson, Daniel E. Bolia, Patrick J. Conlon, Michele Hirshman Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6403528 by Exxon Mobil Corporation.(Simons, Caroline) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification for Justin Anderson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certification for Daniel Bolia, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certification for Patrick Conlon, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Certification for Michele Hirshman | ||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Rose, Sr on behalf of Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C. (Rose, Alan) | |
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
9 | 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) | |
8 | 8 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(DaSilva, Carolina) | |
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) | |
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline K. Simons on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation (Simons, Caroline) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Frongillo on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation (Frongillo, Thomas) | |
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pawa Law Group, P.C.. (Chinitz, Michael) | |
3 | 3 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Matthew Pawa in Support re1 MOTION to Quash Nonparty subpoenas issued by Exxon Mobil Corporation to the Pawa Law Group PC and Attorney Matthew Pawa Filing fee: $ 46, receipt number 0101-6388388 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) filed by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Chinitz, Michael) (Modified on 12/8/2016 to Correct Docket Text) (Paine, Matthew). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
2 | 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re1 MOTION to Quash Nonparty subpoenas issued by Exxon Mobil Corporation to the Pawa Law Group PC and Attorney Matthew Pawa Filing fee: $ 46, receipt number 0101-6388388 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) filed by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Chinitz, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
1 | 1 MOTION to Quash Nonparty subpoenas issued by Exxon Mobil Corporation to the Pawa Law Group PC and Attorney Matthew Pawa Filing fee: $ 46, receipt number 0101-6388388 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) by Matthew Pawa, Pawa Law Group, P.C..(Chinitz, Michael) |