California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:16-bk-26337
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 18, 2017
Dismissed:Jan 03, 2017
Terminated:Jan 19, 2017

Debtor
Golden Cactus Investment LLC
6311 Van Nuys Blvd Ste 448
Van Nuys, CA 91401-2611
Represented By
Golden Cactus Investment LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Timothy Yoo (TR)
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP 800 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1260
Los Angeles, CA 90017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/14/2016 12:01 AM PST
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 3:53 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Golden Cactus Investment LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 12/27/2016. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 12/27/2016. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 12/27/2016. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 12/27/2016. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 12/27/2016. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 12/27/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 12/27/2016. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 12/27/2016. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 12/27/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 12/27/2016. (Collins, Kim S.) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2016 (Collins, Kim S.)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Tue 3:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/18/2017 at 01:30 PM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Collins, Kim S.)
Related: [-]