Mississippi Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Katharine M Samson
Case #: 6:16-bk-52144
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Industrial Expeditors, LLC
17399 Biloxi Cutoff Rd.
Saucier, MS 39574
Represented By
Patrick A. Sheehan
Sheehan Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
501 East Court Street Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
37 37 order Amend Application Wed 2:16 PM
Order Granting Amended Application to Employ Patrick A. Sheehan and Sheehan Law Firm, PLLC as Attorney for Debtor Related [+] (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
36 36 court Notice of Deficiency Tue 3:48 PM
Notice of Deficiency (Merchants & Marine Bnk) Related [+] Compliance due date: 1/31/2017. (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-] 32 Schedules/Statements filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC
35 35 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Tue 11:00 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
34 34 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 10:59 AM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Non-Individual (Form 202) Tue 10:59 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 10:57 AM
Schedules/Statements Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
31 31 court Action Required Tue 9:23 AM
Clerk's Notice To: Patrick A. Sheehan - Action Required . Related [+] Tickle for date: 1/31/2017. (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-] 17 Amended Application filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC
Friday, January 13, 2017
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules
29 29 misc Balance Sheet Fri 3:02 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] Small Business Designation
28 28 misc Cash Flow Statement Fri 3:02 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] Small Business Designation
27 27 misc Declaration Fri 1:41 PM
Declaration re: tax returns by Harold Hageman, Manager Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Document Fri 11:34 AM
Document Cash Flow and P&L Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
25 25 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 11:27 AM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information to 01/25/2017 Related [+] (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-] 24
24 24 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 8:55 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 06, 2017
23 23 misc Amended Voluntary Petition Fri 9:39 AM
Amended Voluntary Petition - to reflect debtor is a small business debtor Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
utility Small Business Designation Fri 11:31 AM
Debtor's Election of Small Business Designation Small Business Statement of Operations due 1/9/2017. Small Business Balance Sheet due by: 1/9/2017. Tax Return due 1/9/2017. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due 1/9/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 6/12/2017. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 6/12/2017. (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 02, 2017
22 22 cmp Complaint Mon 3:01 PM
Adversary case 17-06001 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Patrick A. Sheehan on behalf of Industrial Expeditors, LLC against Yellowstone Capital LLC. Receipt Number exempt, Fee Amount $350 (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 31, 2016
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/31/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Thursday, December 29, 2016
20 20 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules Thu 4:49 PM
Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information to 01/11/2017 Related [+] (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-] 19
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
19 19 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 9:34 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
18 18 notice Notice - 21 day Wed 10:39 AM
Amended Notice Allowing 21 Days to File Written Objection/Response. Date of Service: 12/21/2016 Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. Objections due 01/11/2017. Note: See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9006(f). Three additional days may be allowed for qualifying parties. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] 17 Amended Application (related document(s):14 Application to Employ Patrick A. Sheehan as Attorney filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC) Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC
17 17 motion Amended Application Wed 9:29 AM
Amended Application Related [+] Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] 14 Application to Employ Patrick A. Sheehan as Attorney filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC
16 16 notice Notice - 21 day Wed 8:12 AM
Notice Allowing 21 Days to File Written Objection/Response. Date of Service: 12/21/2016 Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. Objections due 01/11/2017. Note: See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9006(f). Three additional days may be allowed for qualifying parties. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] 14 Application to Employ Patrick A. Sheehan as Attorney Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
15 15 misc Declaration Tue 5:05 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Attorney Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] 14 Application to Employ Patrick A. Sheehan as Attorney
14 14 motion Employ (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Tue 5:04 PM
Application to Employ Patrick A. Sheehan as Attorney Filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, December 17, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
Friday, December 16, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order to Debtor Regarding Taxes (Ch. 11)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Deficiency
Thursday, December 15, 2016
10 10 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Thu 8:55 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/25/2017 at 01:30 PM at 341 Mtg - Gpt - Ch 7, 11, 13. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/27/2017. Proofs of Claims due by 4/13/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/12/2017. (Steiskal, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
9 9 order Order to Debtor Regarding Taxes (Ch. 11) Wed 3:18 PM
Order to Debtor Regarding Taxes (Ch. 11) . (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-]
8 8 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 2:11 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-52144 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 8808361. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
7 7 court Notice of Deficiency Wed 11:17 AM
Notice of Deficiency, Notice of Missing Documents Related [+] Compliance due date: 12/28/2016. (Watson, Wanda)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor In Possession Industrial Expeditors, LLC
5 5 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 10:07 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 10:02 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to Rule 1007(a). Filed by Debtor Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 9:58 AM
Schedules/Statements Filed by Debtor Industrial Expeditors, LLC Related [+]. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2 2 misc Matrix Wed 9:58 AM
Matrix Filed by Debtor Industrial Expeditors, LLC. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 9:58 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Industrial Expeditors, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 04/13/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 04/13/2017. Atty Disclosure Statement due 12/28/2016. Employee Income Record due 12/28/2016. Schedule A/B due 12/28/2016. Schedule D due 12/28/2016. Schedule E/F due 12/28/2016. Schedule G due 12/28/2016. Schedule H due 12/28/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/28/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities Due 12/28/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 12/28/2016. (Sheehan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
misc Creditor Disk/Matrix Uploaded Wed 10:01 AM
Creditor Disk/Matrix Uploaded - 8 creditors added by Sheehan, Patrick A. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Case Administrator Assigned Wed 10:41 AM
Case Administrator assigned - Wanda Watson (Wise, Katie)
Related: [-]