Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel S Oppermanbaycity
Case #: 1:16-bk-22172
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
CF Broadcasting LLC
PO Box 807
West Branch, MI 48661
Represented By
David R. Shook
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, January 19, 2017
42 42 misc Monthly Income & Expense Statement Thu 1:04 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for December 31, 2016 Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
41 41 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC Related [+]. (Shook, David)
Related: [-] 37 Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements,40 Deficiency Notice (BK)
40 40 court Deficiency Notice (BK) Tue 12:01 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Missing. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 1/24/2017. (kcm)
Related: [-] 37 Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC
Monday, January 16, 2017
39 39 misc Schedule A/B Mon 2:26 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy for Non-Individual , Schedule A/B: for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy , Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims , Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Periodic Report Concerning Related Entities (Official Form 26) Mon 12:20 PM
Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Estate of Debtor , CF Broadcasting LLC Holds a Substantial or Controlling Interest Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements Mon 12:14 PM
Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements filed Re: List of Creditors Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
36 36 misc Certificate of Service Tue 4:53 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC Related [+]. (Shook, David)
Related: [-] 35 Notice of Withdrawal
35 35 notice Notice of Withdrawal Tue 4:51 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC Related [+]. (Shook, David)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Documents
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Tue 4:50 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC Related [+]. (Shook, David)
Related: [-] 33 Stipulated Order
33 33 order stipulated order Tue 4:36 PM
Order To Extend Time To File Documents. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 32 Stipulation filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC
32 32 misc Stipulation Tue 3:53 PM
Stipulation By and Between Debtor In Possession, CF Broadcasting LLC, and United States Trustee Re: For Entry of an Order Regarding the Debtor's Motion to Extend Time To File Documents . Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
31 31 order Employ Mon 4:09 PM
Order Approving Employment of Counsel for Debtor in Possession Related [+]. (sms)
Related: [-] 30
30 30 motion Employ Mon 9:57 AM
Application to Employ David R. Shook, Attorney at Law, PLLC as Counsel for Debtor In Possession Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
29 29 order Continue/Reschedule/Adjourn Hearing Thu 11:37 AM
Order Adjourning Hearing On Motion To Enforce The Automatic Stay And For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually And As Trustee Of The Warner Family Trust And to Extending Deadline To Respond Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 2/10/2017 at 01:30 PM Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St. for10 and for27 , (lcl)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Enforce filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC,27 Stipulation filed by Creditor Warner Family Trust
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Wed 4:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC Related [+]. (Shook, David)
Related: [-] 20 Order for Initial Ch. 11 Status Conference
27 27 misc Stipulation Wed 3:10 PM
Stipulation By and Between CF Broadcasting and Warner Family Trust Re: to Adjourn Hearing on Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and for Damages against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust and to Extend Deadline to Respond . Filed by Creditor Warner Family Trust. (Schofner, Keith)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules Wed 1:05 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Documents Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Tax Documents Wed 11:08 AM
Tax Documents for the Year for2015 Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Wed 11:06 AM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Statement of Operations for Small Business Wed 11:05 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition (LBR 1074-1) Wed 11:04 AM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Pursuant to LBR 1074-1 Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC Related [+]. (Shook, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
21 21 misc Balance Sheet for Small Business Wed 11:01 AM
Balance Sheet for Small Business Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
20 20 order Initial Ch. 11 Status Conference Thu 3:47 PM
Order for Initial Ch. 11 Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 2/10/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St.. (slh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 12/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
court Minute Entry Tue 4:02 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing not held. Parties to submit an stipulation and order to adjourn matter. Related [+] (Erickson, Wendy)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Enforce filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC
Monday, December 19, 2016
18 18 answer Objection Mon 5:25 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Creditor Warner Family Trust (Schofner, Keith)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust ,11 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten/Reduce Shorten Notice Period and Time to Respond to Debtor In Possession's Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust un
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 5:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice for Peggy Warner and the Warner Family Trust Filed by Creditor Warner Family Trust. (Schofner, Keith)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) Mon 2:51 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/10/2017 at 12:00 PM at Room 103, 101 First St., Bay City 341. Proofs of Claims due by 5/11/2017. (H, Laura)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Striking Document (text) Mon 8:54 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the incorrect event has been used Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman (Skillman, Pamela)
Related: [-] Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements5 Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC
Saturday, December 17, 2016
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC
Thursday, December 15, 2016
13 13 order Set Hearing Thu 5:15 PM
Ex-Parte Order to Shorten Notice Period and Time to Respond to Debtor in Possession Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and for Damages Against the Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 12/20/2016 at 10:00 AM Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St. for10 , (nlt)
Related: [-] 11 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten/Reduce Shorten Notice Period and Time to Respond to Debtor In Possession's Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust until December 19, 2016 at 5:00 PM. filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC.
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal Thu 4:36 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Documents Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC Related [+]. (Shook, David)
Related: [-] 8 Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust ,9 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten/Reduce For Entry of Order to Shorten Notice Period and Time to Repsond to Debtor In Possession's Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the
11 11 motion Shorten/Reduce Thu 4:32 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Shorten/Reduce Shorten Notice Period and Time to Respond to Debtor In Possession's Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust until December 19, 2016 at 5:00 p.m., hearing to be held December 20, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Enforce Thu 4:28 PM
Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Shorten/Reduce Thu 4:20 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Shorten/Reduce For Entry of Order to Shorten Notice Period and Time to Repsond to Debtor In Possession's Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust until December 19, 2016 at 5:00 p.m., hearing to be held December 20, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Enforce Thu 4:13 PM
Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and For Damages Against Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, Individually and as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 court court~-~346 Thu 1:31 PM
Complaint by CF Broadcasting LLC against Peggy R. Warner[LINK 16-02102 dob] ; Nature of Suit(s): 14 Related [+] , Fee Amount $ 350. Filed by CF Broadcasting LLC . (Shook, David)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
6 6 cmp Complaint Thu 1:31 PM
Adversary case 16-02102 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by CF Broadcasting LLC against Peggy R. Warner. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
5 5 misc Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements Thu 12:41 PM
Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements filed Re: List of Creditors Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
court Flags Set CASECHECKED Thu 2:49 PM
Flags Set CASECHECKED. (MMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 11:51 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 11:51 AM
Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Wed 11:51 AM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 11:51 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1717 Filed by CF Broadcasting LLC Schedule A/B due 12/28/2016. Schedule D due 12/28/2016. Schedule E/F due 12/28/2016. Schedule G due 12/28/2016. Schedule H due 12/28/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 12/28/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 12/28/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 12/28/2016. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) Due: 06/12/2017. (Shook, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 12:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-22172 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 28700094, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]