California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sandra R Klein
Case #: 2:16-bk-26393
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Keeney Truck Lines, Inc.
3500 Fruitland Ave
Maywood, CA 90270-2008
Represented By
William P Fennell
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Friday, January 20, 2017
28 28 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 5:23 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1. For the Month Ending 12/2016 Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc.. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
27 27 misc Status report Fri 4:27 PM
Status report Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. Related [+]. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-] 17 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
26 26 notice Notice of motion/application Fri 2:03 PM
Notice of motion/application of Debtor and Debtor in Possession to Employ the Law Office of William P. Fennell, APLC as Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. Related [+]. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-] 25 Application to Employ Law Office of William P. Fennell, APLC as Bankruptcy Counsel ; Declaration of William P. Fennell in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc.
25 25 motion Employ (motion) Fri 1:59 PM
Application to Employ Law Office of William P. Fennell, APLC as Bankruptcy Counsel ; Declaration of William P. Fennell in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (motion) Fri 1:32 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Hoag & Robi, Inc. as Accountant for a Chapter 11 Corporation Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application of Debtor and Debtor in Possession to Employ Hoag & Robi, Inc. as Accountants; Declaration of Bill Robi in Support Thereof
23 23 motion For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (motion) Fri 1:08 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Paul, Plevin, Sullivan & Connaughton LLP as Special Litigation Counsel for a Chapter 11 Corporation Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application of Debtor and Debtor in Possession to Employ Paul, Plevin, Sullivan & Connaughton LLP as Special Litigation Counsel; Declaration of J. Rod Betts in Support Thereof
Saturday, December 24, 2016
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 75. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Thursday, December 22, 2016
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 2:27 PM
Order on Emergency Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll.... (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/22/2016 (May, Thais D.)
Related: [-] 4
18 18 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Thu 1:42 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 5, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
17 17 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 10:56 AM
Order Setting Chapter 11 Case Management Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/22/2016 (May, Thais D.)
Related: [-] 1
court Hearing Set(Motion) Thu 12:55 PM
Hearing Set re chapter 11 case management status conference Related [+] Hearing to be held on 02/15/2017 at 09:30 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1575 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Sandra Klein (May, Thais D.) Modified on 12/22/2016 (May, Thais D.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Keeney Truck Lines, Inc.
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 9:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Order (BNC-PDF)
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 9:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 9:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
13 13 misc Declaration Wed 4:53 PM
Declaration re: Supplemental Declaration of Dan Hubbard in Support of Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. Related [+]. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency motion for Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll, to Continue Pre-Petition Employment Procedures and to Pay Withholding Taxes
12 12 misc Request for special notice Wed 4:35 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Attorney Board of Trustees of the Teamsters and Food Employers Security Trust Fund. (Starkman, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice Wed 4:34 PM
Notice of Errata Filed by Attorney Board of Trustees of the Teamsters and Food Employers Security Trust Fund Related [+]. (Starkman, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 10 Request for special notice Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc..
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
10 10 misc Request for special notice Tue 4:20 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc.. (Starkman, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
9 9 misc Declaration Mon 5:05 PM
Declaration re: Notice of Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. Related [+]. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency motion for Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll, to Continue Pre-Petition Employment Procedures and to Pay Withholding Taxes
8 8 order X - Amended Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF) Mon 2:04 PM
Order (Amended) setting hearing on "emergency motion for order authorizing debtor in possession to pay pre-petition payroll, to continue pre-petition employment procedures and to pay witholding taxes"; (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/19/2016 (Walter, Earnestine)
Related: [-] doc
7 7 court Hearing Set(Motion) Mon 10:44 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 12/21/2016 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (Walter, Earnestine)
Related: [-] 4 Emergency motion filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc.
6 6 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Mon 10:43 AM
Order setting hearing on "emergency motion for order authorizing debtor in possession to pay pre-petition employment procedures and to pay withholding taxes"; (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/19/2016 (Walter, Earnestine)
Related: [-] doc
5 5 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Mon 10:34 AM
Order on emergency motion to limit notice of motion to pay pre-petition payroll, to continue pre-petition employment procedures and to pay witholding taxes on payroll motion; (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/19/2016 (Walter, Earnestine)
Related: [-] 3
Sunday, December 18, 2016
4 4 motion Emergency motion (motion) Mon 12:01 AM
Emergency motion for Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll, to Continue Pre-Petition Employment Procedures and to Pay Withholding Taxes Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dan Hubbard in Support of Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll
3 3 motion Emergency motion (motion) Sun 11:55 PM
Emergency motion to Limit Notice of Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll, to Continue Pre-Petition Employment Procedures and to Pay Withholding Taxes on Payroll Motion Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Wed 9:52 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Keeney Truck Lines, Inc.. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 9:37 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Keeney Truck Lines, Inc. (Fennell, William)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 9:49 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:16-bk-26393) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43876088. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1