United States of America v. Mahrt et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Ann L Aiken |
Case #: | 6:12-cv-01925 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2012 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2013 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2016 6:27 PM PDT |
Defendant
Children in Need Outreach
|
|
Defendant
Deschutes County Tax Collector
|
|
Defendant
Bonnie J Mahrt
|
|
Defendant
Marvin E Mahrt
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 03 2013
ORDER of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale: Granting Motion for Judgment 20. See attached formal order. Signed on 12/3/2013 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh) |