Connecticut District Court
Judge:Vanessa L Bryant
Case #: 3:16-cv-02056
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2017 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By
Seth A. Goldberg
contact info
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
Elizabeth M Lacombe
Duane Morris Llp - Htfd, Ct
contact info
Wayne A. Mack
contact info
Defendant
Citron Pharma, LLC
Represented By
Steven E. Bizar
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
Christine C. Levin
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Krystyna Blakeslee
Dechert Llp - Ct
contact info
Defendant
Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
Melanie L. Katsur
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - Dc
contact info
Christopher B. Leach
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher Llp - Dc
contact info
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
Nathaniel John Gentile
Pullman & Comley - Htfd
contact info
D. Jarrett Arp
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher - Dc
contact info
James T. Shearin
Pullman & Comley
contact info
Defendant
Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc.
Represented By
Michael Martinez
K&l Gates Llp-Chicago
contact info
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
Brian J. Smith
K&l Gates Llp-Chicago
contact info
Steven M. Kowal
K&l Gates Llp-Chicago
contact info
Lauren Norris Donahue
K&l Gates Llp-Chicago
contact info
Sean R. Higgins
K&l Gates, Llp- Ma
contact info
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas J. Amburgy
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Marc E. Kasowitz
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP
contact info
David Evan Ross
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP
contact info
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
James W. Bergenn
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Jill M. O'Toole
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Seth Davis
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, Llp-Ny
contact info
Hector Torres
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By
Mitchell E. Zamoff
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
John R. Robertson
Hogan Lovells Us Llp-Dc
contact info
Justin W. Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Kim E. Rinehart
Wiggin & Dana-Nh
contact info
Robert M. Langer
Wiggin & Dana-Htfd
contact info
Adam K. Levin
Hogan Lovells Us Llp-Dc
contact info
Benjamin F. Holt
Hogan Lovells Us Llp-Dc
contact info
Intervenor
United States of America
Department of Justice, Antitrust Division 450 5th St NW Suite 11300
Washington, DC 20530
Represented By
Ellen Rebecca Clarke
U.S. Dept. Of Justice - Antitrust Division
contact info
Jay David Owen
Department Of Justice, Antitrust Division
contact info
Andrew J. Ewalt
U.S. Dept. Of Justice - Antitrust Division
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
Represented By
Michael E. Cole
Attorney General'S Office-Htfd
contact info
Laura Johnson Martella
Attorney General'S Office - Elm (htfd)
contact info
Antonia Carabillo Conti
Office Of The Connecticut Attorney General
contact info
W. Joseph Nielsen
Attorney General'S Office - Elm St (htfd)
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Delaware
Represented By
Michael A. Undorf
Delaware Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Michael Clarke
Delaware Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Florida
Represented By
Timothy M. Fraser
State Of Florida
contact info
Lizabeth A. Brady
State Of Florida
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Hawaii
Represented By
Rodney I. Kimura
State Of Hawaii
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Idaho
Represented By
John K. Olson
State Of Idaho
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Iowa
Represented By
Layne M. Lindebak
State Of Iowa
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Kansas
Represented By
Lynette R. Bakker
State Of Kansas
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By
LeeAnne Applegate
Commonwealth Of Kentucky
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Louisiana
Represented By
Stacie Lambert deBlieux
State Of Louisiana
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Maine
Represented By
Christina M. Moylan
State Of Maine
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
Represented By
John R. Tennis
State Of Maryland
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By
Carol E. Head
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts
contact info
Michael B. MacKenzie
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts
contact info
William T. Matlack
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts
contact info
Matthew M. Lyons
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
Represented By
Robert Cary
State Of Minnesota
contact info
Justin Erickson
State Of Minnesota
contact info
James Canaday
State Of Minnesota
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Nevada
Represented By
Sheri Ann Forbes
State Of Nevada
contact info
Lucas J. Tucker
State Of Nevada
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New York
Represented By
Robert L. Hubbard
State Of New York
contact info
Plaintiff
State of North Dakota
Represented By
Parrell D. Grossman
State Of North Dakota
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Alabama
Represented By
Billington M. Garrett
Alabama Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Ohio
Represented By
Beth A. Finnerty
State Of Ohio
contact info
James C. Roberts
State Of Ohio
contact info
Brian F. Jordan
State Of Ohio
contact info
Thomas N. Anger
State Of Ohio
contact info
Matthew K. McKinley
State Of Ohio
contact info
Edward J. Olszewski
State Of Ohio
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Tracy W. Wertz
Office Of The Attorney General-PA
contact info
Jennifer J. Kirk
Office Of The Attorney General-PA
contact info
Joseph S. Betsko
Office Of The Attorney General-PA
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Arizona
Represented By
Nancy M. Bonnell
Office Of The Attorney General - Az
contact info
Dana R. Vogel
Office Of The Attorney General - Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By
Tyler T. Henry
Commonwealth Of Virginia
contact info
Sarah Oxenham Allen
Office Of The Attorney General - Va
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Washington
Represented By
Erica A. Koscher
State Of Washington
contact info
Michael Jason Hemker
Washington State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of California
Represented By
Cheryl L. Johnson
contact info
Doan-Phuong (Pamela) Pham
Office Of The Attorney General - La Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
Represented By
Jennifer Hutchinson Hunt
Ralph L. Carr Colorado Judicial Center
contact info
Abigail L. Smith
Ralph L. Carr Colorado Judicial Center
contact info
Devin Michael Laiho
Ralph L. Carr Colorado Judicial Center
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
Represented By
Chadwick O. Brooker
Office Of The Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Robert W. Pratt
Office Of The Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Indiana
Represented By
Justin G. Hazlett
Office Of The Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Tamara L. Weaver
Office Of The Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Amanda Jane Lee
Office Of The Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Michigan
Represented By
D. J. Pascoe
Michigan Dept. Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Mississippi
Represented By
Crystal Utley Secoy
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Montana
Represented By
Charles R. Munson
State Of Montana
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Nebraska
Represented By
Collin Mark Kessner
Nebraska Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Hampshire
Represented By
Brooksley C. Belanger
New Hampshire Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Jennifer Foley
New Hampshire Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
Represented By
Jodie E. Van Wert
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Russell M. Smith, Jr.
State Of New Jersey
contact info
Plaintiff
State of North Carolina
Represented By
Kimberley D'Arruda
North Carolina Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Jessica V. Sutton
North Carolina Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Oklahoma
Represented By
Julie A. Bays
Office Of The Oklahoma Attorney General
contact info
Rachel A. Irwin
Office Of The Oklahoma Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
Represented By
Katherine A. Campbell
Oregon Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Byron D. Hadley
Oregon Department Of Justice
contact info
Laura Johnson Martella
Attorney General'S Office - Elm (htfd)
contact info
Plaintiff
State of South Carolina
Represented By
Rebecca Magill McCormack
State Of South Carolina
contact info
Clark Cassidy Kirkland, Jr.
State Of South Carolina
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Tennessee
Represented By
Cynthia Elaine Kinser
Office Of The Tennessee Attorney General And Reporter
contact info
John David McDowell
Office Of The Tennessee Attorney General And Reporter
contact info
Robert Brant Harrell
Office Of The Tennessee Attorney General And Reporter
contact info
Erin Frankrone Merrick
Office Of The Tennessee Attorney General And Reporter
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Utah
Represented By
David N. Sonnenreich
Utah Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Edward T. Vasquez
Utah Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
Represented By
Jill S. Abrams
Office Of The Attorney General-Montpelier Vt
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin
Represented By
Gwendolyn J. Cooley
Wisconsin Dept. Of Justice
contact info

Docket last updated: 06/22/2017 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
341 341 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12:56 PM
NOTICE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc re 306 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice John Robert Robertson Good Standing Certificate (Rinehart, Kim)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
340 340 order Order on Sealed Motion Fri 5:12 PM
ORDER granting339 Sealed Motion Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.s Sealed Motion to Seal Its Filed In Error Reply In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss The Complaint or for Severance of Claims (ECF 327). The Court finds that D. Conn. L. R. 5(e)3 is satisfied and Dkt.327 should be sealed based on particularized findings that are consistent with those made in the Court's previous322 Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/16/2017. (Lee, E.)
Related: [-]
339 339 motion Sealed Motion Fri 2:19 PM
SEALED MOTION Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.s Sealed Motion to Seal Its Filed In Error Reply In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss The Complaint or for Severance of Claims (ECF 327) by Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc..(Martinez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
338 338 order Order on Sealed Motion Fri 10:00 AM
ORDER granting330 Sealed Motion Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.s Sealed Motion To Seal Its Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss The Complaint Or For Severance Of Claims by Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc.; granting332 Sealed Motion Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Sealed Motion to Seal Portions of its Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; granting335 Sealed Motion Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s Sealed Motion to Seal Portions of its Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. The Court finds that D. Conn. L. R. 5(e)3 is satisfied and Dkts.330 ,331 ,332 ,335 , and337 should be sealed based on particularized findings that are consistent with those made in the Court's previous322 Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/16/2017. (Lee, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
337 337 misc Sealed Document Thu 10:01 PM
Sealed Document: Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s [Unredacted] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. re335 SEALED MOTION Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s Sealed Motion to Seal Portions of its Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint,336 Reply to Response to Motion . (O'Toole, Jill)
Related: [-]
336 336 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 9:56 PM
REPLY to Response to284 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ,282 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint REDACTED filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (O'Toole, Jill)
Related: [-]
335 335 motion Sealed Motion Thu 9:53 PM
SEALED MOTION Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.'s Sealed Motion to Seal Portions of its Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(O'Toole, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
334 334 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 6:02 PM
REPLY to Response to282 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Citron Pharma, LLC, Heritage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Rinehart, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
333 333 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 5:55 PM
REPLY to Response to285 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint REDACTED filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Rinehart, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
332 332 motion Sealed Motion Thu 5:32 PM
SEALED MOTION Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Sealed Motion to Seal Portions of its Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Rinehart, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Sealed Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Seal Portions of its Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit Unredacted Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Reply in Support of Individual Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
331 331 misc Sealed Document Thu 5:27 PM
Sealed Document: Defendant Mayne Pharma, Inc.s Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss The Complaint Or For Severance Of Claims by Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc. re311 Sealed Document,, . (Martinez, Michael)
Related: [-]
330 330 motion Sealed Motion Thu 5:21 PM
SEALED MOTION Defendant Mayne Pharma Inc.s Sealed Motion To Seal Its Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss The Complaint Or For Severance Of Claims by Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc..(Martinez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Brian J. Smith,
Att: 3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
329 329 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 5:11 PM
REPLY to Response to279 MOTION to Dismiss THE STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION UNDER FRCP 21 TO SEVER THE DOXYCYCLINE HYCLATE DR CLAIMS FROM THE GLYBURIDE CLAIMS [AMENDED REDACTED] filed by Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc..(Martinez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
328 328 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 4:59 PM
REPLY to Response to289 MOTION to Dismiss ,291 SEALED MOTION Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Individual Motion to Dismiss the State Attorneys General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc..(Lacombe, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
327 327 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 4:21 PM
REPLY to Response to279 MOTION to Dismiss THE STATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION UNDER FRCP 21 TO SEVER THE DOXYCYCLINE HYCLATE DR CLAIMS FROM THE GLYBURIDE CLAIMS [REDACTED] filed by Mayne Pharma (USA), Inc..(Martinez, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service