Adams et al v. Williams et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jed S Rakoff |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-09677 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332nr Diversity: Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2017 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Christine Adams
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trudy Weste Williams
Terminated: 04/27/2017
|
|
Defendant
Attorney General of the State of New York
Terminated: 02/13/2017
Attorney General of the State of New York 120 Broadway 24th Floor
New York, NY 10271 |
|
Defendant
Lorena Mejia
Terminated: 02/13/2017
|
|
Defendant
Public Administrator of New York County
Terminated: 02/13/2017
Public Administrator of New York County 31 Chambers street Suite 311
New York, NY 10007 |
|
Defendant
Robert Earl Slatus
Terminated: 02/13/2017
Robert E. Slatus Slatus & Slatus 225 West 34th Street
Suite 1303, NY 10122 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Fri 05/12 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
47 | 47
misc
Transcript
Fri 05/12 11:26 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/13/2017 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
order
Judgment
Thu 04/27 12:59 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: Plaintiff having failed to show good cause for her failure to effectservice on Trudy Weste Williams (the sole remaining defendant)within the time period prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), see Order dated April 17, 2017, ECF No. 45, the Court hereby dismisses defendant Williams as well. Since all parties have now been dismissed, the court now enters Final Judgment dismissing the case in its entirety, but noting that the dismissal of Williams is without prejudice, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), as are the dismissals of Slatus, Mejia, the Public Administrator of New York County, and the Attorney General of the State of New York, but the dismissal of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. is with prejudice. Party Trudy Weste Williams terminated. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/26/2017) (kgo) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Thu 04/27 1:01 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (kgo) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Order
Mon 04/17 12:07 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff Christine Adams having filed the operative complaint 1n this action on January 13, 2017, see ECF No. 12, and no proof of service having been filed for the sole remaining defendant, Trudy Weste Williams, this action will be dismissed without prejudice unless the plaintiff submits a letter to the Court by no later than April 21, 2017 showing good cause for her failure to effect service. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) ("If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court - on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff - must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period.") (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/17/2017) (kgo) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 03/23 12:36 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 2/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
43 | 43
misc
Transcript
Thu 03/23 12:35 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 2/6/2017 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen Simone, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 03/16 10:06 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated March 15, 2017, all claims against Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. are hereby dismissed and partial final judgment is entered as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 03/16/2017)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Right to Appeal | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 03/15 5:31 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated from the bench, see transcript dated March 13, 2017, all claims against defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. are hereby dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to close docket entry number 29 and to enter partial final judgment as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/13/2017) (cla) |
|
misc
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
Wed 03/15 5:31 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:41 Order on Motion to Dismiss, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (cla) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
minutes
Oral Argument
Mon 03/13 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 3/13/2017 re:29 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Kotowski, Linda) |
||
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 03/10 4:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/8/2017. (Kotowski, Linda) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Mon 03/06 6:33 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Weiss, Andrea) |
|
39 | 39
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 03/06 6:32 PM
DECLARATION of Benjamin Chun in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Mon 03/06 6:31 PM
DECLARATION of Andrea Likwornik Weiss in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Mon 02/27 7:30 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Dismiss . By Defendant JPMorgan Chase . Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
36 | 36
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Mon 02/27 6:57 PM
DECLARATION of Christine Adams in Opposition re:29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually).(Simermeyer, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Will of Phillip Abrahams, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Original Power of Attorney, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit False Power of Attorney, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit False Will of Phillip Abrahams, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Handwriting Expert Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Chase Form Power of Attorney, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Checks written to Trudy Williams, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Stop Checks, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Certificate of Appointment of Execuor | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Fri 02/17 5:45 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 2/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Transcript
Fri 02/17 5:44 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 2/6/2017 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen Simone, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
33 | 33
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 02/17 4:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Weiss, Andrea) |
|
32 | 32
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 02/17 4:53 PM
DECLARATION of Benjamin Chun in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 02/17 4:52 PM
DECLARATION of Laura L. Deck in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Fri 02/17 4:50 PM
DECLARATION of Andrea Likwornik Weiss in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Fri 02/17 4:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. Responses due by 2/27/2017 Return Date set for 3/13/2017 at 04:00 PM.(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order of Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 02/13 5:32 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated from the bench, see Transcript dated Feb. 6, 2017, defendants Robert E. Slatus, Lorena Mejia (both individually and as employee of defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.), the Public Administrator of New York County, and the Attorney General of the State of New York are dismissed, because they were joined after removal solely to defeat this Court's otherwise proper jurisdiction. See McGee v. State Farm Mut. Auto. Ins. Co., 684 F. Supp. 2d 258, 261-63 (E.D.N.Y. 2009); see also Balfour v. Quest Diagnostics Inc., No. 11-cv-4701 (JSR), 2012 WL 335666, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 1, 2012). The two governmental defendants are dismissed for the additional reason that they were improperly joined under Rule 20(a) (2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as the plaintiff brought no claims against them. The dismissals of defendants Slatus and Mejia, against whom fraud claims were brought, are without prejudice to them being the subject of a lawsuit brought in state court. (Lorena Mejia (As employee of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.), Public Administrator of New York County (Public Administrator of New York County), Robert Earl Slatus (Robert E. Slatus), Attorney General of the State of New York (Attorney General of the State of New York) and Lorena Mejia (Individually) terminated.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/10/2017) (cla) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 02/13 2:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/10/2017. (Kotowski, Linda) |
||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Tue 02/07 12:26 PM
ORDER denying18 Motion to Remand. For the reasons stated from the bench, see Transcript dated Feb. 6, 2017, the plaintiff's motion to remand this action to state court is hereby denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close docket entry number 18. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/6/2017) (cf) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Deleted Document
Tue 02/07 5:02 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 28 Order of Reference. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (cla) |
||
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
minutes
Oral Argument
Mon 02/06 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Oral Argument held on 2/6/2017 re:18 FIRST MOTION to Remand New York State Supreme Court County of New York . filed by Christine Adams. (Kotowski, Linda) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 02/01 11:46 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Trudy Weste Williams. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Service was attempted on 1/31/2017. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
25 | 25
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Wed 02/01 11:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams) served on 1/31/2017, answer due 2/21/2017; Christine Adams(Individually) served on 1/31/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. Service was accepted by Co-Worker. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams); Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/01 11:40 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Lorena Mejia (As employee of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.) served on 1/31/2017, answer due 2/21/2017. Service was accepted by Co-Worker. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams); Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 02/06 10:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/1/2017. (Kotowski, Linda) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Mon 01/30 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/5/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Transcript
Mon 01/30 3:35 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/5/2017 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/30 3:02 PM
DECLARATION of Andrea Likwornik Weiss in Opposition re:18 FIRST MOTION to Remand New York State Supreme Court County of New York .. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Feit, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
20 | 20
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Mon 01/30 2:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:18 FIRST MOTION to Remand New York State Supreme Court County of New York . . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Feit, Gregory) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 01/27 2:42 PM
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:18 FIRST MOTION to Remand New York State Supreme Court County of New York .,17 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court New York State Supreme Court County of New York . New York State Supreme Court County of New York . Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Remand
Fri 01/27 2:40 PM
FIRST MOTION to Remand New York State Supreme Court County of New York . Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually). Return Date set for 2/6/2017 at 04:00 PM.(Simermeyer, James) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
Fri 01/27 1:17 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney James Francis Simermeyer to RE-FILE Document 17 FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court New York State Supreme Court County of New York. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - First file the ATTACHED NOTICE AS THE MOTION to Remand first. Then file and link any supporting documents. (db) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Remand to State Court
Tue 01/17 3:26 PM
FIRST MOTION to Remand to State Court New York State Supreme Court County of New York . Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually). Return Date set for 2/6/2017 at 04:00 PM.(Simermeyer, James) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 01/17 1:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Francis Simermeyer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lorena Mejia as Employee of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Lorena Mejia individuall. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (dgo) |
||
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 01/16 3:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint,,. Service was accepted by Clerk of Public Administrator of NY County. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/16 3:31 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint,, served. Public Administrator of New York County served on 1/12/2017, answer due 2/2/2017. Service was accepted by Clerk of Public Administrator of NY County. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams); Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/16 3:28 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint,, served. Service was accepted by Jeffrey C. Slatus Attorney. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams), Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 01/16 3:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,. Robert Earl Slatus served on 1/12/2017, answer due 2/2/2017. Service was accepted by Jeffrey C. Slatus Attorney. Document filed by Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams); Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/13 10:40 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending11 Amended Complaint,9 Amended Complaint, against John and Jane Does 1-10, JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Trudy Weste Williams, Robert Earl Slatus, Lorena Mejia as Employee of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Lorena Mejia individuall, Public Administrator of New York County, Attorney General of the State of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Adams(Individually), Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams). Related document:11 Amended Complaint, filed by Christine Adams,9 Amended Complaint, filed by Christine Adams.(Simermeyer, James) |
|
Att: 1 2 of 2 of Second Amended Complaint | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Fri 01/13 8:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James Francis Simermeyer to RE-FILE re: Document No. 11 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Add Robert E Slatus, Lorena Mejia in both capacities, Public Administrator of New York County, Attorney General. The PDF is a little fuzzy, please attempt to clear up. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dgo) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 01/12 1:20 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending9 Amended Complaint, against John and Jane Does 1-10, JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Trudy Weste Williams with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Adams(Individually), Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams). Related document:9 Amended Complaint, filed by Christine Adams.(Simermeyer, James) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Case Management Plan
Thu 01/05 6:41 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 6/5/2017. Motion To Remand: Moving: 1/17; Answering: 1/30; Oral Argument set for 2/6/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. After consultation with counsel for the parties, the following Case Management Plan is adopted. This plan is also a scheduling order pursuant to Rules 16 and 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The case is to be tried to a jury. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2017. All Deposition due by 5/5/2017. All Discovery due by 5/3/2017. Motion to Dismiss: Moving: 2/17; Answering: 2/27; Reply: 3/06. Oral Argument set for 3/13/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Motions due by 5/15/2017. Responses due by 5/25/2017 Replies due by 5/30/2017. A Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/05/2017) (ama) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 01/06 1:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/5/2017. (Kotowski, Linda) |
||
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 01/04 9:25 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against John and Jane Does 1-10, JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., Trudy Weste Williams with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Adams(Individually), Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams).(Simermeyer, James) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 12/23 1:37 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME: The time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., sued herein as JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended from December 22, 2016 to and including January 19, 2017. JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A. answer due 1/19/2017. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/21/2016) (kgo) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/20 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Francis Simermeyer on behalf of Christine Adams(as Executrix for the Estate of Philip Abrahams). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/20 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Francis Simermeyer on behalf of Christine Adams(Individually). (Simermeyer, James) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/19 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter Everett Swearingen on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Swearingen, Walter) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 12/19 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/5/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/19/2016) (kgo) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 12/16 1:52 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (laq) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 12/16 1:52 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (laq) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 12/16 1:53 PM
Case Designated ECF. (laq) |
||
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/15 1:09 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A.. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 12/15 1:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiss, Andrea) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 12/15 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 655511-2016. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13101427).Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A..(Weiss, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |