Kruchoski et al v. MiMedx Group, Inc. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Richard H Kyle |
Referred: | Becky R Thorson |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-04171 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2017 3:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
MiMedx Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Parker Petit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jess Kruchoski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke Tornquist
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/07 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/01 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mack H Reed on behalf of Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist. |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/30 3:13 PM
TEXT ENTRY ONLY NOTICE: Due to the pending motion to dismiss, there is good cause to delay scheduling the Rule 16 Pretrial Conference until after the motion to dismiss has been decided. (MSK) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/26 4:56 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. BlackRock, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant MiMedx Group, Inc.. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Declaration in Support
Thu 01/26 4:51 PM
Declaration of Mark L. Block in Support of21 MOTION to Dismiss/General ,24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit.(Pentelovitch, William) |
|
Att: 1 77 pgs Exhibit(s) A-F | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
respm
Declaration in Support
Thu 01/26 4:48 PM
Declaration of Parker Petit in Support of21 MOTION to Dismiss/General ,24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
26 | 26
28
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 01/26 4:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Parker Petit.(Pentelovitch, William) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 01/26 4:43 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
24 | 24
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 01/26 4:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Parker Petit. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
23 | 23
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 01/26 4:37 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by MiMedx Group, Inc..(Pentelovitch, William) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 01/26 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION21 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Richard H. Kyle. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss/General
Thu 01/26 4:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/General by MiMedx Group, Inc.. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 01/06 2:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist re4 Amended Complaint (Premo, Stephen) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/06 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist. (Premo, Stephen) |
|
18 | 18
service
Amended Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/06 2:04 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/TO BE REFILED - AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist. All Defendants. (Premo, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2017 (las) |
|
17 | 17
service
Amended Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/06 2:02 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/TO BE REFILED -AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luke Tornquist. All Plaintiffs. (Premo, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2017 (las) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/06 1:55 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/TO BE REFILED - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist. All Plaintiffs. (Premo, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2017 (las) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 01/06 1:51 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/TO BE REFILED - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist. All Plaintiffs. (Premo, Stephen) Modified on 1/6/2017 (las) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order
Fri 01/06 11:15 AM
ORDER. Defendants' time in which to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is extended to January 26, 2017. This Stipulation is approved without waiver of, or prejudice to, Defendants' right and ability to plead any and all defenses and affirmative defenses they might assert to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/5/2017. (ACH) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
Wed 01/04 4:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit re12 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/04 3:59 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. Jointly Signed by Jess Kruchoski and Luke Tornquist. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/04 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leora Itman on behalf of MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. (Itman, Leora) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/29 2:07 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph D. Wargo for MiMedx Group, Inc. and Parker Petit; granting8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark L Block for MiMedx Group, Inc. and Parker Petit; granting9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Shanon McGinnis for MiMedx Group, Inc. and Parker Petit. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/29/16. (AKL) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Wed 12/28 4:46 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shanon McGinnis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5266317 by MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Wed 12/28 4:40 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark L. Block. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5266286 by MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Wed 12/28 4:30 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph D.Wargo. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5266220 by MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 12/28 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Z Pentelovitch on behalf of All Defendants. (Pentelovitch, William) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Fri 12/16 10:02 AM
ORDER regarding Judge Richard H. Kyle's dispositive motion procedure. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 12/16/16. (KLL) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
24
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 12/15 4:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. Filed by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist. No summons requested. (Premo, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/15 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to MiMedx Group, Inc., Parker Petit. (kt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 12/15 10:38 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Richard H Kyle per Civil Rights List and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R Thorson. Please use case number 16-cv-4171 RHK/BRT. (kt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/15 9:22 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5244132.) Filed by Jess Kruchoski, Luke Tornquist. Filer requests summons issued. (Premo, Stephen) Modified text on 12/15/2016 (kt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 FILED IN ERROR: Summons and Complaint |