California Central District Court
Judge:Philip S Gutierrez
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:16-cv-09278
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2016
Terminated:May 16, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2017 2:23 AM PDT
Defendant
EHM Productions, Inc.
Represented By
Linda M Burrow
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Defendant
TMZ.com
Represented By
Linda M Burrow
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Linda M Burrow
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
TMZ Production, Inc
Represented By
Linda M Burrow
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Darnell Riley Perez
Represented By
Emanuel Zola
Zola Wegman And Associates Apc
contact info
Stephen D Wegman
Zola Wegman And Associates Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
18 18 order Dismissing Case Thu 10:19 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez17 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (pso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2017
17 17 stip Dismiss Case Thu 1:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and Settlement Agreement (Agreement) filed by DARNELL RILEY PEREZ Darnell Riley Perez.(Wegman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
16 16 order Substitute Attorney Wed 10:36 AM
ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Granting15 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: EHM Productions Inc. and Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Defendant, to substitute Linda M. Burrow, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Linda M. Burrow, Kimberly M. Singer (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
15 15 motion Substitute Attorney (G-01) Fri 5:37 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Linda M. Burrow of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP in place of attorney Linda M. Burrow of Caldwell Leslie & Proctor, PC filed by Defendants EHM Productions, Inc., TMZ Production, Inc, TMZ.com, Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc.. (Burrow, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 07, 2017
14 14 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 4:13 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2017 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10:39 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition12 filed by Defendants EHM Productions, Inc., TMZ Production, Inc, TMZ.com, Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc..(Burrow, Linda)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
12 12 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 2:25 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Darnell Riley Perez Darnell Riley Perez(Wegman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants EHM Productions, Inc., TMZ Production, Inc, TMZ.com, Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc., (Burrow, Linda)
Related: [-]
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 12:39 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 2/17/2017; TMZ Production, Inc answer now due 2/17/2017; EHM Productions, Inc. answer now due 2/17/2017; TMZ.com answer now due 2/17/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc.; TMZ Production, Inc; EHM Productions, Inc.; TMZ.com.(Attorney Linda M Burrow added to party EHM Productions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Linda M Burrow added to party TMZ Production, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Linda M Burrow added to party TMZ.com(pty:dft), Attorney Linda M Burrow added to party Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Burrow, Linda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
9 9 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 5:05 PM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Darnell Riley Perez, upon Defendant EHM Productions, Inc. served on 12/29/2016, answer due 1/19/2017; TMZ Production, Inc served on 12/29/2016, answer due 1/19/2017; Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc. served on 12/29/2016, answer due 1/19/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(Wegman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service of Summons,
Att: 2 Proof of Service of Summons
8 8 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 11:40 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Darnell Riley Perez. (Wegman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 12:56 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 8:35 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. Attachments # Civil Cover Sheet, Attachment # 4 Notice of Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1 Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form Mon 8:26 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 8:25 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants EHM Productions, Inc., TMZ Production, Inc, TMZ.com, Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 8:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 8:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
1 1 2 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19064453 - Fee: $400, filed by DARNELL RILEY PEREZ Darnell Riley Perez. (Attorney Stephen D Wegman added to party Darnell Riley Perez(pty:pla))(Wegman, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit application for copyright registration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Registration,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Notice of Interested Parties