CF Broadcasting LLC v. Warner
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-22172
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-22172
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Daniel S Oppermanbaycity |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-02102 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Peggy R. Warner
as Trustee of Warner Family Trust 152 Turtle Cove Court
Pointe Vedra Beach, FL 32082 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CF Broadcasting LLC
PO Box 807
West Branch, MI 48661 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/18 9:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-2102 Closed. (Mum, J) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/17 2:24 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . (nlt) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/17 11:05 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Debtor In Possession, CF Broadcasting LLC and Defendant, Peggy R. Warner, as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust . Filed by Plaintiff CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David) |
|
court
Minute Entry. Order to Show Cause Dissolved
Thu 08/17 3:28 PM
Minute Entry. Order to Show Cause Dissolved. (we ) |
||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 08/18 9:02 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:16-ap-2102 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
audio
.
Thu 08/03 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/3/2017 1:45:02 PM ]. File Size [ 1180 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:55 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Thu 08/03 2:12 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held and Continued Hearing scheduled 08/17/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St.. (we ) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Fri 07/21 9:36 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Hearing scheduled 08/03/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St.. (we ) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Continue/Reschedule/Adjourn Hearing
Wed 07/19 2:52 PM
Order Adjourning Show Cause Hearing - Show Cause Hearing adjourned to 08/03/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St.. (Mum, J) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/19 11:54 AM
Stipulation By and Between Debtor In Possession, CF Broadcasting LLC and Defendant, Peggy R. Warner, as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust Re: For Entry of Order Adhjourning Show Cause Hearing . Filed by Plaintiff CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Settlement Status Order and Setting Hearing
Wed 06/07 2:01 PM
Settlement Status Order and Setting Hearing - Required Documents due by 07/05/2017; Show Cause hearing to be held on 07/20/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St. (Mum, J) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Mediator's Certification Pursuant to L.B.R. 7016-2(a)(7)
Fri 05/19 11:12 AM
Mediator's Certification Pursuant to L.B.R. 7016-2(a)(7) was conducted, achieved a settlement of the dispute and signed a written settlement memorandum Filed by Mediator Michael E. Baum . (Baum, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
stipulated order
Mon 05/01 11:40 AM
Order Amending Order Appointing Mediator In Adversary Proceeding . (Mum, J) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/01 9:31 AM
Stipulation By and Between Debtor In Possession, CF Broadcasting, LLC, and Creditor, Peggy R. Warner, as Trustee of the Warner Family Trust Re: for Entry of an Order Amending Order Appointing Mediator in Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David) |
|
court
Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual)
Mon 05/01 11:42 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on May 1, 2017 by the United States Postal Service to Michael Baum, 40950 North Woodward Avenue, Suite 100, Bloomfield Hills, Michigan 48304 |
||
Sunday, April 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 04/10 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Mediation
Fri 04/07 11:55 AM
Order Appointing Mediator In An Adversary Proceeding - Michael E. Baum is appointed as Mediator; Mediation to be completed by 06/02/2017. (Mum, J) |
|
court
Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual)
Fri 04/07 11:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on April 7, 2017 by the United States Postal Service to Michael Baum, 40950 NorthWoodward Avenue, Suite 100, Bloomfield Hills, Michigan 48304 . (Mum, J) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
court
Minute Entry
Fri 03/24 3:13 PM
Minute Entry. Order For Mediation To Be Issued. (Skillman, Pamela) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
order (Generic)
Fri 03/24 8:19 AM
Order Compelling Parties To Submit To Non-Binding Mediation - Document(s) Regarding Mediation due on 04/06/2017. (Mum, J) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference
Thu 03/16 2:17 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff CF Broadcasting LLC. (Shook, David) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference
Wed 02/15 11:27 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 3/23/2017 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St.. (Erickson, Wendy) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/14 2:59 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Peggy R. Warner . (Schofner, Keith) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 02/10 4:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice (AP)
Tue 02/07 8:53 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Missing or Non-Compliant. Proof of Service Due on 2/14/2017. (Erickson, Wendy) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/06 4:41 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Peggy R. Warner. (Schofner, Keith) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
stipulated order
Thu 02/02 9:53 AM
Order Setting Aside Default Entry By Clerk - Answer due on 02/06/2017 . (Mum, J) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/01 3:16 PM
Stipulation By and Between David R. Shook, Keith A. Schofner Re: Stipulation to Set Aside Default . Filed by Plaintiff CF Broadcasting LLC, Defendant Peggy R. Warner. (Schofner, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 01/23 8:33 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Peggy R. Warner - Default Judgment Motion due by 02/06/2017. (Mum, J) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 12/15 1:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Keith E. Moir, Esq. 12/15/2016; CF Broadcasting LLC 12/15/2016; Peggy R. Warner 12/15/2016 (Shook, David) Removed Keith E. Moir, Esq. as a Defendant on 12/16/2016 (adeld) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Thu 12/15 1:31 PM
Summons Issued on Peggy R. Warner Answer Due 01/17/2017 (Shook, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/15 1:31 PM
Adversary case 16-02102 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by CF Broadcasting LLC against Peggy R. Warner. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Shook, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 |