Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:16-bk-12808
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lensar, Inc.
2800 Discovery Dr
Orlando, FL 32826-3010
Represented By
Matthew Summers
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. LENSAR files for bankruptcy with PDL BioPharma support (ophthalmologytimes.modernmedicine.com)
Submitted Tue 01/10/2017
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, January 20, 2017
89 89 trustee 341 Meeting Held and Concluded Fri 2:24 PM
Minute Sheet 341 Meeting Held and Concluded Filed by U.S. Trustee. (U.S. Trustee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
88 88 order Shorten Time Wed 2:52 PM
Order Granting Motion for Expedited Consideration of the Debtor's Motion for Authority (I) To File Portions of its Schedules, Revised Credit Matrix and Affidavits of Service Containing Customer Information Under Seal and (II) To File Portions of its Schedules Containing Employee Compensation Information Under Seal. Related [+] Order Signed on 1/18/2017. (LCN)
Related: [-] 84 ,85
87 87 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Wed 1:18 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re Omnibus Notice of Motions and Final Hearing Thereon . Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 81
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
86 86 court Supplement Tue 11:17 PM
Supplement to Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs- Global Notes Related [+] Filed by Lensar, Inc.. (Summers, Matthew)
Related: [-] 82 ,83
85 85 motion Shorten - Motion Tue 10:53 PM
Motion to Shorten \\ Motion for Expedited Consideration of the Debtor's Motion for Authority (I) to File Portions of its Schedules, Revised Credit Matrix and Affidavits of Service Under Seal and (II) to File Portions of its Schedules Containing Employee Compensation Information Under Seal Related [+] Filed by Lensar, Inc.. (Summers, Matthew)
Related: [-] 84
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order
84 84 motion File Under Seal - Motion (B) Tue 10:49 PM
Motion to File Under Seal \\ Debtor's Motion for Authority (I) to File Portions of its Schedules, Revised Credit Matrix and Affidavits of Service Under Seal and (II) to File Portions of its Schedules Containing Employee Compensation Information Under Seal Related [+] Filed by Lensar, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/30/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/27/2017. (Summers, Matthew)
Related: [-] lated to Docket No. 82
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
83 83 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 10:41 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. - REDACTED Filed by Lensar, Inc.. (Summers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
82 82 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 10:38 PM
[SEALED] Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Lensar, Inc.. (Summers, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
81 81 notice Hearing - Notice Fri 10:06 PM
Notice of Hearing of Final Hearing on Critical Vendor Motion and DIP Financing Motion Related [+] Filed by Lensar, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/30/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/23/2017. (Summers, Matthew)
Related: [-] 50 ,51 ,65 ,77