Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Daniel S Oppermanflint
Case #: 4:16-bk-32849
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 23, 2017

Debtor
Meatloaf Inc
1093 W Pine Ave
Mount Morris, MI 48458-1002
Represented By
John A. Zintsmaster
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Collene K. Corcoran
P.O. Box 535
Oxford, MI 48371


Docket last updated: 12/17/2016 12:02 AM EST
Friday, December 16, 2016
crditcrd none Fri 11:29 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-32849 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 28716184, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 11:28 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy : Fee Amount $335. Filed by Meatloaf Inc (Zintsmaster, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Fri 11:28 AM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor Meatloaf Inc. (Zintsmaster, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 11:28 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor Meatloaf Inc. (Zintsmaster, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (b) Fri 12:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Collene K. Corcoran, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at Room G-19, 600 Church St., Flint 341. (admin, )
Related: [-]