South Carolina District Court
Judge:Bruce Howe Hendricks
Case #: 4:16-cv-03915
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2016
Terminated:Feb 16, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jan 29, 2017 4:31 AM EST
Defendant
Dale Buchanan
Represented By
Lisa Arlene Thomas
Thompson And Henry
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Delpercio
Represented By
Lisa Arlene Thomas
Thompson And Henry
contact info
Defendant
Horry County
Represented By
Samuel F Arthur, III
Aiken Bridges Nunn Elliott And Tyler
contact info
Defendant
Horry County Police Department
Represented By
Samuel F Arthur, III
Aiken Bridges Nunn Elliott And Tyler
contact info
Defendant
Saundra Rhodes
Represented By
Lisa Arlene Thomas
Thompson And Henry
contact info
Defendant
Scott Rutherford
Represented By
Lisa Arlene Thomas
Thompson And Henry
contact info
Defendant
William Squires
Represented By
Lisa Arlene Thomas
Thompson And Henry
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe-1
Represented By
James Bernice Moore, III
Evans Moore LLC
contact info
Scott Christopher Evans
Evans Moore LLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 02/21/2017 11:59 PM EST
Thursday, February 16, 2017
12 12 order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Thu 11:18 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 2/16/2017. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2017
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 12:47 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Horry County, Horry County Police Department.(Arthur, Samuel)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11:15 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Horry County, Horry County Police Department.(Arthur, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
9 9 order Mediation Order Thu 9:57 AM
MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 7/10/2017, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/12/2017. (prou, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 9:55 AM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/2/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/16/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 2/16/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/9/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/10/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/11/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/11/2017, Discovery due by 7/10/2017, Motions due by 8/9/2017, Mediation Due by 7/10/2017. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial after November 7, 2017. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/12/2017. (prou, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 1:44 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dale Buchanan, Thomas Delpercio, Saundra Rhodes, Scott Rutherford, William Squires.(Thomas, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 1:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Dale Buchanan, Thomas Delpercio, Saundra Rhodes, Scott Rutherford, William Squires.(Thomas, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, December 16, 2016
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 9:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Dale Buchanan, Thomas Delpercio, Horry County, Horry County Police Department, Saundra Rhodes, Scott Rutherford, William Squires. Service due by 3/16/2017. (hcic, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 9:02 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Jane Doe-1. (hcic, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 9:01 AM
COMPLAINT against Dale Buchanan, Thomas Delpercio, Horry County, Horry County Police Department, Saundra Rhodes, Scott Rutherford, William Squires (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-6905642), filed by Jane Doe-1. (hcic, )
Related: [-]