California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:16-bk-26464
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 18, 2017

Debtor
Frery's Egg, Corp.
13209 Barton Cir Ste A
Whittier, CA 90605-3290
Represented By
Eric C Hanson
Law Offices Of Eric C. Hanson
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Timothy Yoo (TR)
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP 800 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1260
Los Angeles, CA 90017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/17/2016 12:02 AM PST
Friday, December 16, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 3:29 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-26464) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43890451. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Fri 3:34 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/18/2017 at 04:30 PM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Hanson, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 3:29 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Frery's Egg, Corp. (Hanson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 electronic declaration
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Fri 3:31 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Frery's Egg, Corp.. (Hanson, Eric)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement Fri 3:34 PM
Statement regarding authority to sign and file petition Filed by Debtor Frery's Egg, Corp.. (Hanson, Eric)
Related: [-]