California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:16-bk-26507
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Blackridge Group, Inc.
1749 E 28th St
Signal Hill, CA 90755-1923
Represented By
Allan O Cate
Cate Legal Group
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Thursday, January 19, 2017
28 28 misc Notice of Lodgment Thu 10:28 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) Related [+]. (Yip, Hatty)
Related: [-] 22 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert or appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee with an Order Directing Payment of Quarterly Fees and for Judgment Thereon ,27 Stipulation By United States Trustee (LA) and Debtor to Dismiss Case with Judgment for Payment of Quarterly Fees in resolution of United States Trustee's Motion under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1112(b)(1) to Convert, Dismiss, or Appoint a Chapter 11 Tru
27 27 motion Stipulation (motion) Thu 10:24 AM
Stipulation By United States Trustee (LA) and Debtor to Dismiss Case with Judgment for Payment of Quarterly Fees in resolution of United States Trustee's Motion under 11 U.S.C. Sec. 1112(b)(1) to Convert, Dismiss, or Appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (Yip, Hatty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of UST's motion to dismiss or convert case - Ch 11 to 7 (BNC)
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
25 25 misc Notice to Pay Court Costs Due (BNC Option) Tue 2:40 PM
Notice to Pay Court Costs Due Sent To: Allan Cate, Attorney for Debtor in Possession, Total Amount Due $0 . (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Notice of UST's motion to dism or conv (11 to 7) (BNC) Tue 2:38 PM
Notice of UST's motion to dismiss or convert case - chapter 11 to 7 (BNC) (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-]
23 23 court Hearing Set(Motion) Tue 2:37 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/2/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 22 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA)
22 22 motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Tue 1:02 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert or appoint a Chapter 11 Trustee with an Order Directing Payment of Quarterly Fees and for Judgment Thereon Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA). (united states trustee (hy))
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
21 21 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 8:33 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect event code was used to file this document. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT EVENT. Related [+] (Beauchamp (Cheek), Sonia)
Related: [-] 19 Addendum to Vol Pet filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
20 20 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Tue 10:54 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Statement of Corporate Ownership filed., Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc. Related [+]. (Cate, Allan)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
19 19 misc Addendum to Vol Pet Tue 10:48 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition (Declaration Timothy Pak Re Debtor's Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Projected Budget, Income Statement and Tax Returns Per 11 U.S.C. Section 1116(1) Filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.. (Cate, Allan)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Tue 10:46 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.. (Cate, Allan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 24, 2016
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Thursday, December 22, 2016
15 15 court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 4:03 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/15/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1539, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sheri Bluebond (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.
14 14 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 4:02 PM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference in a Chapter 11 Case; Status Conference set for: FEBRUARY 15, 2017 @ 10AM; (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/22/2016 (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] doc
13 13 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Thu 1:41 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/19/2017 at 01:30 PM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/20/2017. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 9:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) (BNC)
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 9:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC)
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 9:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.
9 9 misc List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Wed 7:30 PM
List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.. (Cate, Allan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
8 8 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Mon 5:21 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Rode, Lauren. (Rode, Lauren)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Mon 8:56 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC) Mon 8:56 AM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Related [+] (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.
5 5 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Mon 8:51 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Mon 8:42 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Debtor/joint debtor/creditor/party was not entered in the system at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. DEBTOR'S DBA HAS BEEN ADDED - D3 Group Related [+] (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.
misc Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Mon 8:55 AM
Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) Related [+] Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/3/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 1/3/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 1/3/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/3/2017. (Jackson, Wendy Ann)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.
Sunday, December 18, 2016
3 3 misc Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi Sun 6:47 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual:: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) Filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.. (Cate, Allan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Sun 6:43 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Blackridge Group, Inc.. (Cate, Allan)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 6:41 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Blackridge Group, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 01/3/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/3/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/3/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/3/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/3/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/3/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/3/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/3/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/3/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/3/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/3/2017. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 01/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/3/2017. (Cate, Allan)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sun 6:42 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:16-bk-26507) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43894194. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1