California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter Carroll
Case #: 9:16-bk-12347
Case Filed:Dec 18, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 23, 2017

Debtor
Underwater Galleries LLC
830 Santa Ysidro Road
Santa Barbara, CA 93108
Represented By
Daniel A Higson
Hathaway Perrett Webster Powers
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jerry Namba (TR)
504 East Chapel Street
Santa Maria, CA 93454
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/19/2016 12:02 AM PST
Sunday, December 18, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sun 3:19 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:16-bk-12347) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43894089. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Sun 3:26 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at 128 E Carrillo St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Higson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sun 3:15 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Underwater Galleries LLC (Higson, Daniel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Sun 3:16 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Underwater Galleries LLC. (Higson, Daniel)
Related: [-]