California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Meredith A Jury
Case #: 6:16-bk-21049
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 26, 2017

Debtor
Cherokee Chain Link And Construction, Inc.
34345 Stowe Road
Hemet, CA 92545
Represented By
Arnold H Wuhrman
Serenity Legal Services, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Charles W Daff (TR)
2107 N. Broadway Suite 308
Santa Ana, CA 92706
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 12/19/2016 6:41 PM PST
Monday, December 19, 2016
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Mon 5:32 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/26/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. (Wuhrman, Arnold)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 5:33 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:16-bk-21049) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43902436. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 5:29 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Cherokee Chain Link And Construction, Inc. (Wuhrman, Arnold)
Related: [-]