Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:David M Lawson
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:16-cv-14406
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 1:14 AM EST
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
Defendant
Google, Inc.
Defendant
Twitter, Inc.
Plaintiff
Chavis Crosby
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Earl Crosby
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Crosby
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Pedro Jorge Diaz
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Aryam Guerrero
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Ramon Guerrero
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Maya Guerrero
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Liz M. Jorge-Reyes
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenetra Parker-Harris
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Gabriel Jorge Reyes
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Pedro Jorge Reyes
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Yazmin Reyes
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Celia Ruiz
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Iris Reyes Santiago
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
The Estate of Javier Jorge-Reyes
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
The Estate of Juan Ramon Guerrero, Jr.
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
The Estate of Tevin Eugene Crosby
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Osvaldo Vazquez
Represented By
Keith L. Altman
Finkelstein & Partners
contact info

Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM EST
Friday, January 20, 2017
10 10 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 4:31 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Twitter, Inc. (Waxman, Seth)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 4:28 PM
STIPULATION to Set Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Twitter, Inc. (Waxman, Seth)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Fri 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Carome on behalf of Twitter, Inc.. (Carome, Patrick)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Fri 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Seth P. Waxman on behalf of Twitter, Inc.. (Waxman, Seth)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2016
6 6 notice Appearance Fri 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Kresch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kresch, Ari)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Fri 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Solomon M. Radner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Radner, Solomon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
4 4 service Summons Issued* Tue 10:41 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Facebook, Inc.* (BGar)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Tue 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Google, Inc.* (BGar)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Tue 10:39 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Twitter, Inc.* (BGar)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 10:48 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (BGar)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6006585 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: San Francisco. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Altman, Keith)
Related: [-]