Josef Maatuk v. Emerson Electric, Inc. et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas M Parker |
Referred: | Thomas M Parker |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-03023 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 17, 2017 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Therm-O-Disc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josef Maatuk
1607 South Sherbourne Drive
Los Angeles, CA 90035 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Emerson Electric, Inc.
Terminated: 12/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Prasad Khadkikar
Terminated: 12/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bernd Zimmerman
Terminated: 12/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
100 | 100
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 10/30 4:31 PM
True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Federal Circuit: Affirming the District Court's judgment re95 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 19-1615 . Date issued as mandate 10/28/19, Costs: $228.08 taxed against the appellant Josef Maatuk (H,SP) |