Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Cynthia Reed Eddy
Case #: 2:16-cv-01879
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 10:28 AM EST
Defendant
ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Defendant
SGT. JESSE ANDRASCIK
Defendant
ORLANDO HARPER
Defendant
MONICA LONG
Defendant
SIMON WAINWRIGHT
Plaintiff
KIARI DAY
Represented By
David B. Fawcett, III
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RIVA DEPASSE
Represented By
David B. Fawcett, III
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH SEITZ
Represented By
David B. Fawcett, III
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MERSIHA TUZLIC
Represented By
David B. Fawcett, III
Reed Smith LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11:48 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint. The new deadline for the Response/Reply will be addressed at the conference scheduled for 4/7/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/15/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Eddy, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
19 19 misc Proposed Order Tue 4:08 PM
Proposed Order re18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JESSE ANDRASCIK, ORLANDO HARPER, MONICA LONG, SIMON WAINWRIGHT. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 3:56 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JESSE ANDRASCIK, ORLANDO HARPER, MONICA LONG, SIMON WAINWRIGHT. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
17 17 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 4:17 PM
Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/23/2017. A Status Conference is set for 4/7/2017 at 09:30 AM in Room 10160 before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Court Reporter: none) (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 1:38 PM
ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference set for 2/23/2017 at 3:00 PM is hereby RESCHEDULED as an in-person Status Conference on 2/23/2017 at 02:30 PM in Room 10160 before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/22/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Consent to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 10:41 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by KIARI DAY, RIVA DEPASSE, JILL HENDRICKS, ELIZABETH SEITZ, MERSIHA TUZLIC. (Rose, Sara)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Consent to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 9:33 AM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JESSE ANDRASCIK, ORLANDO HARPER, MONICA LONG, SIMON WAINWRIGHT. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2017
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10:33 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ALLEGHENY COUNTY answer due 3/20/2017; JESSE ANDRASCIK answer due 3/20/2017; ORLANDO HARPER answer due 3/20/2017; MONICA LONG answer due 3/20/2017; SIMON WAINWRIGHT answer due 3/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/16/2017. (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 2:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, JILL HENDRICKS, RIVA DEPASSE, MERSIHA TUZLIC by ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JESSE ANDRASCIK, ORLANDO HARPER, MONICA LONG, SIMON WAINWRIGHT. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11:59 AM
TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 2/22/2017, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/15/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 11:58 AM
ORDER: A Telephone Status Conference is hereby scheduled for 2/23/2017 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy re8 Motion to Certify Class filed by KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, JILL HENDRICKS, RIVA DEPASSE, MERSIHA TUZLIC. No briefing schedule will issue until after the Telephone Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/15/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
9 9 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 12:02 PM
BRIEF in Support re8 Motion to Certify Class filed by KIARI DAY, RIVA DEPASSE, JILL HENDRICKS, ELIZABETH SEITZ, MERSIHA TUZLIC. (Morgan-Kurtz, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Certify Class Tue 12:00 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by KIARI DAY, RIVA DEPASSE, JILL HENDRICKS, ELIZABETH SEITZ, MERSIHA TUZLIC. (Morgan-Kurtz, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Bacharach on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JESSE ANDRASCIK, ORLANDO HARPER, MONICA LONG, SIMON WAINWRIGHT. (Bacharach, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 5:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JILL HENDRICKS, MERSIHA TUZLIC, KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, RIVA DEPASSE. JESSE ANDRASCIK waiver sent on 12/19/2016, answer due 2/17/2017. (Fawcett, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 5:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JILL HENDRICKS, MERSIHA TUZLIC, KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, RIVA DEPASSE. MONICA LONG waiver sent on 12/19/2016, answer due 2/17/2017. (Fawcett, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 5:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JILL HENDRICKS, MERSIHA TUZLIC, KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, RIVA DEPASSE. SIMON WAINWRIGHT waiver sent on 12/19/2016, answer due 2/17/2017. (Fawcett, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 5:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JILL HENDRICKS, MERSIHA TUZLIC, KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, RIVA DEPASSE. ORLANDO HARPER waiver sent on 12/19/2016, answer due 2/17/2017. (Fawcett, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 5:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JILL HENDRICKS, MERSIHA TUZLIC, KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, RIVA DEPASSE. ALLEGHENY COUNTY waiver sent on 12/19/2016, answer due 2/17/2017. (Fawcett, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Mon 3:54 PM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JESSE ANDRASCIK, ORLANDO HARPER, MONICA LONG, SIMON WAINWRIGHT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4184763), filed by MERSIHA TUZLIC, JILL HENDRICKS, KIARI DAY, ELIZABETH SEITZ, RIVA DEPASSE. (jsp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Summons Allegheny County,
Att: 4 Summons Orlando Harper,
Att: 5 Summons Simon Wainwright,
Att: 6 Summons Monica Long,
Att: 7 Summons Jesse Andrasckik
service Summons Issued Mon 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to *ALLEGHENY COUNTY, JESSE ANDRASCIK, ORLANDO HARPER, MONICA LONG, SIMON WAINWRIGHT* (jsp)
Related: [-]