California Central District Court
Judge:Philip S Gutierrez
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:16-cv-09352
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause33:1365 Environmental Matters
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 12:19 AM PST
Defendant
Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
Defendant
Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement
Defendant
David Fish
Defendant
United States Department of the Interior
Defendant
Richard Yarde
Plaintiff
California Coastal Commission
Represented By
George M Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
David G Alderson
Deputy Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
People of The State of California
Represented By
George M Torgun
Earthjustice
contact info
David G Alderson
Deputy Attorney General
contact info

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
12 12 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 7:27 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Phillip S. Gutierrez. Effective December 19, 2016, Judge Gutierrez will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 6A on the 6th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 6A of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 7:25 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
10 10 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 9:45 AM
Dkt. entry # 9 is duplicate of dkt. entry # 8. Please disregard dkt. entry # 9. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ji)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 9:40 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 8:08 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
7 7 order Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34) Wed 2:34 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:14-cv-09281 PSG (SHx). Case transferred from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-09352 PSG (FFMx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (esa)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 3:52 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Bureau of Safety and Environmental Enforcement, David Fish, United States Department of the Interior, Richard Yarde. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Mon 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff People of The State of California. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-08418, 2:16-cv-08473 (Torgun, George)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 2:11 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff People of The State of California. (Torgun, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 2:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff People of The State of California. (Torgun, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 2:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19076275 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff People of The State of California. (Attorney George M Torgun added to party People of The State of California(pty:pla))(Torgun, George)
Related: [-]