California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:16-cv-07241
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 12:16 AM PST
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff
Lenza H McElrath III, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By
Randy Scott Erlewine
Phillips, Erlewine, Given & Carlin LLP
contact info


1. Uber lawsuit alleges employees were misled on equity compensation (social.techcrunch.com)
Submitted Thu 12/22/2016
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM PST
Thursday, January 19, 2017
17 17 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 1:02 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Uber Technologies, Inc... (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 1:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Tue 10:40 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Edward Gibbs Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 12:52 PM
NOTICE by Lenza H McElrath, III NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-13 (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Fri 12:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Lenza H McElrath, III (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
11 11 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 10:42 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lenza H McElrath, III. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 12/22/2016, answer due 1/12/2017. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 2:38 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lenza H McElrath, III.. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 3:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Case Management Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a case management conference is scheduled for March 23, 2017 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
7 7 order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 1:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on December 20, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order of Recusal Tue 11:56 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/20/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 10:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Uber Technologies, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 10:29 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 8:14 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 4:36 PM
Proposed Summons. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING, FALSE PROMISE, INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION, VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE SECTION 970, AND VIOLATION OF UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW against Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11018505.). Filed byLenza H McElrath III, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated.(Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet