McElrath v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-07241 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 17, 2017 3:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lenza H McElrath, III
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 30 2017
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 18 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017) |
1. | Uber lawsuit alleges employees were misled on equity compensation (social.techcrunch.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/22/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 07/26 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff's Rule 41(a) Notice of Dismissal of Action by Lenza H McElrath, III (Conlon, Brian) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 06/28 9:11 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 43 Stipulation to Stay Action Pending Final Settlement. Stipulation of dismissal due by August 1, 2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 06/27 5:57 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 41 Case Management Conference - Further,,42 Supplemental Brief,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay Action Pending Final Settlement filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
oth_sup
Supplemental Brief
Mon 06/25 4:42 PM
Supplemental Brief re 41 Case Management Conference - Further,, Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Class Claims, or in the Alternative, Stay Entire Proceeding filed byLenza H McElrath, III. (Erlewine, Randy) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of R. Scott Erlewine In Support of Plaintiff's Supplemental Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Class Claims, or in the Alternative, Stay Entire Proceeding | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
minutes
Case Management Conference - Further
Wed 06/13 2:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/13/2018. Plaintiff to file supplemental opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by 6/25/2018. Defendant to reply by 7/2/2018. Upon the submission of the supplemental briefing, the Court will take the matter under submission. (Not Reported)(Time: 4 mins.) Attorneys for Plaintiff: R. Scott Erlewine.; Brian Conlon Attorneys for Defendant: Patrick Gibbs; Samantha Kirby. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2018) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Wed 06/06 7:20 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lenza H McElrath, III. (Erlewine, Randy) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 05/08 12:38 PM
To all parties and counsel of record:Please take notice that due to the Court's unavailability, the case management conference currently scheduled for June 7, 2018 is continued to June 13, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 04/24 1:49 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the case management conference currently scheduled for April 26, 2018 is continued to June 7, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. An updated joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Case Management Statement
Thu 04/19 12:53 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Lenza H McElrath, III. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 4/19/2018) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 02/26 9:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the case management conference currently scheduled for March 1, 2018 is continued to April 26, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Case Management Statement
Thu 02/22 3:28 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Lenza H McElrath, III. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 2/22/2018) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 01/22 11:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that by the request of the parties, the case management conference currently scheduled for January 25, 2018 is continued to March 1, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 01/17 10:03 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Lenza H McElrath, III. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/17/2018) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 12/04 11:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the case management conference currently scheduled for December 7, 2017 is continued to January 25, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 11/30 10:01 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lenza H McElrath, III. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 11/30/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Thu 03/30 9:55 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 18 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Transcript Order
Wed 03/29 11:54 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/23/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Lenza H McElrath, III, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Transcript
Wed 03/29 11:44 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/23/2017, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2017. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/29/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Transcript Order
Tue 03/28 5:29 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 23, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Ton, Michelle) (Filed on 3/28/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 03/24 8:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2017 re 18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Class Claims, or in the alternative, Stay Entire Proceeding filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn.) Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration is denied and the case is stayed. The Court will issue an order and schedule a case management conference for early December. Attorneys for Plaintiff: R. Scott Erlewine.; Brian Conlon Attorney for Defendant: Patrick Gibbs. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2017) Modified on 3/24/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Case Management Statement
Thu 03/16 2:18 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lenza H McElrath, III. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 3/16/2017) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 03/10 1:16 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Fri 03/03 5:10 PM
REPLY Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Reply in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Class Claims, or in the alternative, Stay Entire Proceeding filed byUber Technologies, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 3/3/2017) |
|
22 | 22
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 03/03 9:08 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Time of Case Management Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that the case management conference currently scheduled for March 23, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. shall commence at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. The joint case management statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 03/02 12:40 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 02/24 2:31 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE REPLACEMENT FOR DOCKET#19 filed byLenza H McElrath, III.(Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of R. Scott Erlewine ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Lenza H. McElrath ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration | ||
19 | 19
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Fri 02/24 2:12 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byLenza H McElrath, III.(Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Lenza H. McElrath ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration | ||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Compel
Fri 02/10 5:24 PM
MOTION to Compel Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's Individual Claims and Stay Class Claims, or in the alternative, Stay Entire Proceeding; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plantiff's Individual Claims and Stay Class Claims, or in the alternative, Stay Entire Proceeding filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 2/24/2017. Replies due by 3/3/2017.(Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 2/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Wendy J. Brenner, | ||
Att: 2 53 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Andrew Wegley, | ||
Att: 4 11 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/19 1:02 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Uber Technologies, Inc... (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 01/17 1:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 01/17 10:40 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/17 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Edward Gibbs Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/13 12:52 PM
NOTICE by Lenza H McElrath, III NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-13 (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 01/13 12:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Lenza H McElrath, III (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 01/06 10:42 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gibbs, Patrick) (Filed on 1/6/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 01/04 2:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lenza H McElrath, III. Uber Technologies, Inc. served on 12/22/2016, answer due 1/12/2017. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/4/2017) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/04 2:38 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lenza H McElrath, III.. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 1/4/2017) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 12/27 3:17 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Case Management Conference. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a case management conference is scheduled for March 23, 2017 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed seven days prior to the conference. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 12/20 1:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on December 20, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 12/20 11:56 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/20/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/20 10:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Uber Technologies, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 12/20 10:29 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 12/20 8:14 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 12/19 4:36 PM
Proposed Summons. (Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 12/19/2016) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/19 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING, FALSE PROMISE, INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION, VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE SECTION 970, AND VIOLATION OF UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW against Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11018505.). Filed byLenza H McElrath III, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated.(Erlewine, Randy) (Filed on 12/19/2016) |
|
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 24 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |