California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:16-cv-07198
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2016 3:27 PM PST
Defendant
Versace USA, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Alan Schwachter
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Sampino
Represented By
Stephen Noel Ilg
Hoffman Employment Lawyers
contact info
Michael Robert Hoffman
Hoffman Employment Lawyers LLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM PST
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 2:05 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Versace USA, Inc... (Hui, Michael) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2016
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 8:51 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2017 at 01:30 PM. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
Related: [-]
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/30/2016. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Versace USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gianni Versace S.p.A. for Versace USA, Inc. (Schwachter, Joseph) (Filed on 12/16/2016) Modified on 12/19/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG16839178. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11012226). Filed byVersace USA, Inc..(Schwachter, Joseph) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael J. Hui in Support of Defendant Versace USA, Inc.'s Notice to Federal Court of Removal of Civil Action from State Court,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jennifer Schwartz in Support of Defendant Versace USA, Inc.'s Notice to Federal Court of Removal of Civil Action from State Court
1 1 Civil Cover Sheet by Versace USA, Inc. . (Schwachter, Joseph) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
Related: [-]