Bank of America, N.A., et al v. The Grove Homeowners Association et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-02939 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 17, 2017 3:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sandor Feher
3964 Pembridge Court
Las Vegas, NV 89121 |
|
Defendant
The Grove Homeowners Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Federal National Mortgage Association
Akerman LLP 1160 Town Center Drive Suite 330
Las Vegas, NV 89144 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bank of America, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 29, 2021 | ||
51 | 51
1
pgs
appeal
Order on Mandate
Wed 12/29 10:48 AM
ORDER on49 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to47 MEMORANDUM AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court as to43 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) |