Barwood Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 0:16-bk-26548
Lead case is: 0:16-bk-26548
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas J Catliota |
Case #: | 0:16-bk-26550 |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 23, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 03, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Barwood Inc.
4900 Nicholson Ct
Kensington, MD 20895-1076 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
1. | Montgomery's largest taxi company Barwood Taxi Service files for Bankruptcy (nbcwashington.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/22/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
order
Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 03/03 11:26 AM
Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case . (Cumberland, Erica) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Application
Wed 02/14 12:23 PM
Notice of Application.Notice Served on 2/14/2018, Filed by Montgomery County, Maryland . Objections due by 3/7/2018. (Stoner, Tamara) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/14 12:20 PM
Motion (Motion for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim Owed by Barwood, Inc.) Filed by Montgomery County, Maryland. (Stoner, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/21 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
court
Claims Memo
Tue 07/18 8:25 AM
Memo Re: Claim #18. Official Bankruptcy Form B410 was not filed. (Yalley, Joyce) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 06/30 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/27 11:58 AM
Order Granting Motion For Relief From the Automatic Sta . (Johnson, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/31 2:30 PM
Movant's Motion for Leave of Court to Proceed with the Appeal against Respondent Filed by Creditor Edmund Awah . (Johnson, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Withdrawal of Document
Tue 05/02 3:17 PM
Withdrawal of Document on behalf of Antonio Escoto Filed by Payman Tehrani . (Tehrani, Payman) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/18 3:41 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion 16-26550 [motion,mrlfntc] ( 181.00). Receipt number 30478832. Fee amount 181.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion
Tue 04/18 3:38 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion Re: Insurance Coverage. Fee Amount $181. Notice Served on 4/18/2017, Filed by Antonio Escoto. Objections due by 05/2/2017. with three additional Court days allowed if all parties are not served electronically. Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 at 10:00 AM - Courtroom 3-E. (Tehrani, Payman) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Main Document | ||
trustee
Chapter 11 341 Meeting Report
Tue 04/18 9:41 AM
U.S. Trustee's 341 Meeting Report: The U.S. Trustee hereby reports that the Meeting of Creditors for this case was conducted and concluded by the U.S. Trustee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 341(a)on 1/23/2017. Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 03/23 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 50. Notice Date 03/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Relief from Stay
Mon 03/20 3:14 PM
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay |
|
28 | 28
court
Hearing Held
Mon 03/20 1:12 PM
Hearing Held . MOTION GRANTED, ORDER DUE BY THE COURT. (Hester, Rita) |
|
Sunday, March 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 03/13 1:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/10 9:34 AM
Order Granting Motion To Waive Filing Fee for . (Johnson, Jean) |
|
Sunday, February 12, 2017 | ||
court
ADI process Return Mail
Sun 02/12 10:10 AM
Returned Mail: mail sent via USPS was returned as undeliverable for the following: Mailed on 12/22/2016 a notice RE: Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 TO David Dorsey Attention Cady Thomas George Assoc PO Box 30 Syosset, NY 11791-0030. (admin) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/07 1:02 PM
Motion to Waive Filing Fee for20 Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Edmund Awah . (Johnson, Jean) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Motion (sets obj deadline)
Tue 02/07 12:57 PM
Notice of Motion.Notice Served on 2/3/2017, Filed by Edmund Awah . Objections due by 2/20/2017.Hearing scheduled for 3/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3-E, Greenbelt - Judge Catliota. (Johnson, Jean) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/20 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors
Tue 01/17 5:04 PM
Schedules A-H on behalf of Barwood Inc., Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual on behalf of Barwood Inc., Verification of Creditor Matrix on behalf of Barwood Inc., Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual on behalf of Barwood Inc., Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Alan M. Grochal. (Grochal, Alan) |
|
21 | 21
court
Deficiency Notice
Tue 01/17 12:59 PM
Deficiency Notice ( Notice of Motion Hearing Date and Filing Fee) . Cured Pleading due by 1/31/2017. (Johnson, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Relief from Stay (Court use only)
Tue 01/17 12:54 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay Re: |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 12/28 2:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Zvi Guttman. (Guttman, Zvi) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (attorney/Trustee use)
Wed 12/28 11:31 AM
Notice of Time Change of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Barwood Inc. . (Grochal, Alan) |
|
Saturday, December 24, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 12/25 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 46. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 12/23 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/22/2016. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 12/23 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 44. Notice Date 12/22/2016. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
Hearing Held
Thu 12/22 4:44 PM
Hearing Held . ALL MOTIONS ARE GRANTED, COURT TO ENTER ORDER FOR4 AND DEBTOR TO UPLOAD ORDERS FOR [5-7] (Hester, Rita) |
|
13 | 13
order
Joint Administration
Thu 12/22 4:39 PM
Order Granting4 Emergency Motion for Joint Administration of cases 16-26548 16-26550 16-26551 16-26552 16-26553 and 16-26555 filed by Debtor Barwood Inc. Case 16-26548 TJC is designated as the Lead Case. (Rybczynski, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 12/21 7:33 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (attorney/Trustee use)
Tue 12/20 3:53 PM
Notice of Hearing on First Day Motions Filed by Barwood Inc. . (Selba, Joseph) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Adequate Protection
Tue 12/20 3:28 PM
Emergency Motion for Adequate Protection, Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and Scheduling a Final Hearing Filed by Barwood Inc.. (Grochal, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
court
Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents
Tue 12/20 2:52 PM
Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents and Warning of Possible Dismissal. Schedule A/B due 1/3/2017. Schedule D due 1/3/2017. Schedule E/F due 1/3/2017. Schedule G due 1/3/2017. Schedule H due 1/3/2017. Declaration for Schedules due 1/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/3/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 1/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due 1/3/2017 (Devine, Ellen) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/20 1:28 PM
Emergency Motion to Pay to Drivers Pre-Petition Expenses Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business Filed by Barwood Inc.. (Grochal, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pay Pre-Petition Wages
Tue 12/20 12:28 PM
Emergency Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Payroll Taxes and Employee Benefits Filed by Barwood Inc.. (Lilja, Marissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/20 12:03 PM
Emergency Motion for Authority to Maintain and Use Certain Existing Bank Accounts and Continue Electronic Banking within Existing Cash Management System Filed by Barwood Inc.. (Grochal, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Joint Administration
Tue 12/20 11:46 AM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration with Cases 16-26548 16-26551 16-26552 16-26553 Filed by Barwood Inc.. (Grochal, Alan) Modified on 12/20/2016 (Devine, Ellen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Tue 12/20 10:51 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-26550 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 29816393. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Tue 12/20 10:27 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Alan M. Grochal. (Grochal, Alan) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 12/20 10:26 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Barwood Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 04/19/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/19/2017. (Grochal, Alan) |
|
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tue 12/20 10:30 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) |
||
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 12/20 11:17 AM
Judge Wendelin I. Lipp added to case. Involvement of Judge Lori S. Simpson Terminated. (Giddings, Betty) |
||
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 12/20 2:11 PM
Judge Thomas J. Catliota added to case. Involvement of Judge Wendelin I. Lipp Terminated. (Giddings, Betty) |