California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:16-bk-13571
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 23, 2017

Debtor
G & O Management Co
12793 Bradley Ave
Sylmar, CA 91342-4612
Represented By
G & O Management Co
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Diane Weil (TR)
16000 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1000
Encino, CA 91436
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/20/2016 12:02 PM PST
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 10:50 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by G & O Management Co Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/3/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 1/3/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 1/3/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 1/3/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 1/3/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 1/3/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 1/3/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/3/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/3/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/3/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 1/3/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 1/3/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 1/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 1/3/2017. (Bever, Sabine)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Tue 10:53 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/23/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. (Bever, Sabine)
Related: [-]
3 3 court X - Document (Generic) Tue 11:06 AM
Document Filed by Related [+] (Fisher, Liliana)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor G & O Management Co