California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter Carroll
Case #: 9:16-bk-12371
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Terminated:May 30, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
North Park Investments, LLC
5716 Corsa Avenue Suite 110
Westlake, CA 91362
Represented By
Al West
West & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
44 44 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 11:58 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. Related [+] (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12,5 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor North Park Investments, LLC, 13 Hearing (Bk Other) Set
Monday, May 22, 2017
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $22.00 by 09. Receipt Number 90024887. (admin)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 9:30 PM
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $3.00 by 09. Receipt Number 90024887. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 05. Receipt Number 10070162. (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 13, 2017
43 43 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 9:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, May 11, 2017
42 42 order Relief from stay - REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) Thu 3:39 PM
Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/11/2017 (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 29
Thursday, May 04, 2017
41 41 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 10:00 AM
Hearing Held - Granted Related [+] (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 29 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Monday, April 24, 2017
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 9:31 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 18. Receipt Number 90024820. (admin)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 9:31 PM
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $1.50 by 18. Receipt Number 90024820. (admin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 15, 2017
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 9:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, April 13, 2017
39 39 order Relief from stay - REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) Thu 2:46 PM
Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/13/2017 (Ortiz, Amber)
Related: [-] 25
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
38 38 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 1:08 PM
Hearing Held - Granted Related [+] (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, as servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee for MortgageIT Trust 2005-2
Sunday, April 09, 2017
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/09/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order Barring Debtor (BNC-PDF)
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/09/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 07, 2017
35 35 order Barring Debtor (BNC-PDF) Fri 9:33 AM
Order Barring Debtor (BNC-PDF)Barred Debtor North Park Investments, LLC starting 4/7/2017 to 10/4/2017 Signed on 4/7/2017 Related [+]. (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 30 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for the WaMu Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2003-AR3
34 34 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 9:26 AM
Order Granting Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/7/2017 (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
33 33 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 2:04 PM
Hearing Vacated - Off Calendar RE:1 Ch.11 Status Conference. (Ortiz, Amber)
Related: [-]
32 32 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 2:02 PM
Hearing Held - Granted Related [+] (Ortiz, Amber)
Related: [-] 17 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND)
Monday, April 03, 2017
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 9:31 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 09. Receipt Number 90024779. (admin)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Mon 9:31 PM
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $1.50 by 09. Receipt Number 90024779. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2017
31 31 court Hearing Set(Motion) Thu 8:24 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 5/3/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Peter Carroll (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 29 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
30 30 motion Dismiss Case by Trustee (motion) Wed 4:53 PM
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (Joinder to) Filed by Creditor Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for the WaMu Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2003-AR3 (Raftery, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits part 1
Att: 2 Exhibits part 2
29 29 motion Relief - Real Property (motion) Wed 3:00 PM
Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 1130 N. Edison Street, Stockton, CA 95203-2319 with proof of service . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Foreman, Brandye)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-7
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 3:01 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property(9:16-bk-12371-PC) [motion,nmrp] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44518590. Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#29
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 9:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)
Monday, March 20, 2017
27 27 order Relief from stay - REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) Mon 9:05 AM
Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/20/2017 (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, March 17, 2017
26 26 court Hearing Set(Motion) Fri 3:48 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 4/12/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Peter Carroll (Bertelsen, Susan)
Related: [-] 25 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, as servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee for MortgageIT Trust 2005-2
25 25 motion Relief - Real Property (motion) Fri 1:47 PM
Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 2015 Cedar Street, Ramona, California 92065 . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, as servicer for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Indenture Trustee for MortgageIT Trust 2005-2 (Wojtanowicz, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A_Note
Att: 2 Exhibit B_Deed of Trust
Att: 3 Exhibit C_Assignment
Att: 4 Exhibit D_Deeds and Multiple BK Filings
Att: 5 Exhibit E_Debtor's relevant portion Schedule
Att: 6 Exhibit F_Preliminary title report
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Fri 1:49 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property(9:16-bk-12371-PC) [motion,nmrp] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44443186. Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#25
Thursday, March 09, 2017
24 24 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 12:52 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Fredrich, Christopher. (Fredrich, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
22 22 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 11:14 AM
Hearing Vacated - Continued to April 5, 2017 Related [+] (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
21 21 court Hearing Held (Motion) Wed 11:14 AM
Hearing Held - Granted Related [+] (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Monday, March 06, 2017
20 20 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 10:21 AM
Hearing Continued (RE CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE), hearing to be held on 4/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Peter Carroll (Rust, Kam)
Related: [-]
19 19 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Mon 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE (The new hearing date is April 5, 2017, at 10:00 a.m.) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/6/2017. (Rust, Kam)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Hearing Set(Motion) Mon 7:59 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 4/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Peter Carroll (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 17 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND)
Friday, March 03, 2017
17 17 motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Fri 4:36 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case with an Order Directing Payment of Quarterly Fees and for Judgment Thereon and for a Bar of 180-Days Against Refiling; Declaration of Bankruptcy Analyst with proof of service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (ND). (Fittipaldi, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
16 16 misc Request for special notice Thu 9:45 AM
Request for special notice Filed by Creditor Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for the WaMu Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2003-AR3. (Raftery, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
14 14 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 10:09 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Richey, Cassandra. (Richey, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
13 13 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 10:25 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 3/8/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Peter Carroll (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
12 12 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 9:41 AM
Order to (1) Disclose Single Asset Real Estate; (2) File Status Report; (3) Attend Status Conference; and (4) File Monthly Interim Statements and Operating Reports (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/15/2017 (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, February 10, 2017
11 11 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 11:10 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Tsagaris, Maria. (Tsagaris, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
10 10 court Hearing Set(Motion) Thu 4:26 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 3/8/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Peter Carroll (Rust, Kam)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
9 9 motion Relief - Real Property (motion) Thu 2:50 PM
Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 1102 Penninman, El Dorado Hills, California 95762 with Proof of Service . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-12
8 8 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 2:15 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Campbell, Greg. (Campbell, Greg)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 3:05 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property(9:16-bk-12371-PC) [motion,nmrp] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44202003. Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#9
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
7 7 misc Request for special notice Wed 2:49 PM
Request for special notice and Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Renovation Resolutions, LLC.. (Nichani, Vinod)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 9:15 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Treder, Edward. (Treder, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
5 5 misc Amended List of Creditors (Fee) Wed 4:10 PM
Amendment to List of Creditors. Fee Amount $31, Amending Schedules (D) Filed by Debtor North Park Investments, LLC . (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-]
4 4 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 11:02 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Tsagaris, Maria. (Tsagaris, Maria)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Wed 9:30 PM
Receipt of Amendment Filing Fee - $31.00 by 00. Receipt Number 90024591. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2016
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 39. Notice Date 12/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Wed 1:45 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/26/2017 at 09:00 AM at 128 E Carrillo St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. (Davis, Cheri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 4:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by North Park Investments, LLC (Ortiz, Amber)
Related: [-]
court U - Assigned Judge to a case (Manual) Tue 4:01 PM
Judge Peter Carroll added to case (Ortiz, Amber)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Wed 8:30 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00 by 03. Receipt Number 90024541. (admin)
Related: [-]