District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Royce C Lamberth
Case #: 1:16-cv-02478
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2016 1:39 AM EST
2255
SALLY JEWELL
U.S. Department of the Interior Secretary of the Interior 1849 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20240
2255
OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT
1951 Constitution Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20240
2255
JOSEPH PIZARCHIK
Director of the Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enf 1951 Constitution Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20240
Petitioner
STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
North Dakota Office of the Attorney General 500 N. 9th Street
Bismarck, ND 58501
Represented By
Paul Martin Seby
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Respondent
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
U.S. Department of the Interior 1849 C Street, NW
Washington, DC 20240


1. North Dakota files lawsuit to block new federal coal mining law (bismarcktribune.com)
Submitted Wed 12/21/2016
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 3:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas S. Waldo, :Firm- Earthjustice, :Address- 325 Fourth Street, Juneau, AK 99801. Phone No. - 907-500-7129. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4811327. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPALACHIAN VOICES, CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE, COAL RIVER MOUNTAIN WATCH, COOK INLETKEEPER, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, NORTHERN PLAINS RESOURCE COUNCIL, OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION, SIERRA CLUB, SOUTHERN APPALACHIAN MOUNTAIN STEWARDS, STATEWIDE ORGANIZING FOR COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, WEST VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS CONSERVANCY(Cheuse, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 3:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenta Tsuda, :Firm- Earthjustice, :Address- 325 Fourth Street, Juneau, AK 99801. Phone No. - 907-500-7129. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4811305. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by APPALACHIAN VOICES, CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE, COAL RIVER MOUNTAIN WATCH, COOK INLETKEEPER, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, NORTHERN PLAINS RESOURCE COUNCIL, OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION, SIERRA CLUB, SOUTHERN APPALACHIAN MOUNTAIN STEWARDS, STATEWIDE ORGANIZING FOR COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, WEST VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS CONSERVANCY(Cheuse, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 motion Intervene Wed 1:44 PM
MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by APPALACHIAN VOICES, CENTER FOR COALFIELD JUSTICE, COAL RIVER MOUNTAIN WATCH, COOK INLETKEEPER, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, NORTHERN PLAINS RESOURCE COUNCIL, OHIO VALLEY ENVIRONMENTAL COALITION, SOUTHERN APPALACHIAN MOUNTAIN STEWARDS, SIERRA CLUB, STATEWIDE ORGANIZING FOR COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, WEST VIRGINIA HIGHLANDS CONSERVANCY, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE(Cheuse, Emma) (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/18/2017) (td)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Answer,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Declaration Appendix,
Att: 5 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-App. Voices,
Att: 6 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-CCJ,
Att: 7 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-CRMW,
Att: 8 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-CI,
Att: 9 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-Defenders,
Att: 10 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-NPRC,
Att: 11 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-OVEC,
Att: 12 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-SAMS,
Att: 13 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-Sierra Club,
Att: 14 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-SOCM,
Att: 15 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-WA,
Att: 16 Exhibit Cert of Corp Disclosure-WVHC
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
20 20 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12:09 PM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth as related. Judge Rudolph Contreras no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 11:40 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 1/4/2017 (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 11:38 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SALLY JEWELL served on 1/4/2017 (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 11:37 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT served on 1/4/2017 (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Wed 11:36 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/4/2017. (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Wed 11:35 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH PIZARCHIK served on 1/4/2017 (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Wed 11:32 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/4/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/5/2017. (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
13 13 notice Notice of Related Case Tue 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Defendants. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-2506. (Most, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Most on behalf of All Defendants (Most, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 3:55 PM
NOTICE to Court by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA re10 Notice of Related Case(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Murray Energy Corporation's Notice of Related Civil Cases
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
10 10 notice Notice of Related Case Tue 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. Case related to Case No. 16-2506 (Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Wed 12:04 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to SALLY JEWELL, OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(sb)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Wed 11:03 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Channing D. Phillips, U.S. Attorney, District of Columbia re2 Errata,1 Complaint, filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. Related document:2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA,1 Complaint, filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Wed 11:01 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General re2 Errata,1 Complaint, filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. Related document:2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA,1 Complaint, filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11:24 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
6 6 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 4:44 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Joseph Pizarchik, Director of Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement re2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. Related document:2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 4:42 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement re2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. Related document:2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 4:41 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Sally Jewell, Secretary of the Interior re2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. Related document:2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request for Summons to Issue Tue 4:38 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE United States Department of the Interior re2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. Related document:2 Errata filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Errata Tue 2:08 PM
ERRATA by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA1 Complaint, filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Attachment A - Final Rule
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT and Petition for Review against SALLY JEWELL, OFFICE OF SURFACE MINING RECLAMATION AND ENFORCEMENT, JOSEPH PIZARCHIK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4782248) filed by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA.(Seby, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Stream Protection Rule,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet