Modular Space Corporation
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12825
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12825
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12827 |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Modular Space Corporation
1200 W Swedesford Rd
Berwyn, PA 19312-1172 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago |
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Final Decree
Wed 12/20 8:46 AM
Final Decree and Order (I) Closing the Remaining Cases of Modular Space Holdings, Inc., et al., (II) Discharging and Releasing Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC from Further Duties as Court-Appointed Claims and Noticing Agent, and (III) Granting Related Relief Order Signed on 12/20/2017 (LMD) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 12/20 8:52 AM
Bankruptcy Case 16-12827 Closed (LMD) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 01/23 1:36 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Guadalupe County, Denton County. (Gordon, Lee) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 12/22 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case consolidating the chapter 11 cases of Modular Space Intermediate Holdings, Inc.; Modular Space Corporation; Resun ModSpace, Inc.; ModSpace Government Financial Services, Inc.; ModSpace Financial Services Canada, Ltd.; and Resun Chippewa, LLC with the case of Modular Space Holdings, Inc. for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in the chapter 11 cases of Modular Space Holdings, Inc., Case No. 16-12825 (KJC), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 12/22/2016 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 12/21 2:22 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael J. Sage of Dechert LLP . Receipt Number 1869022, Filed by Ad Hoc Noteholder Group. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 12/21 3:44 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-12827 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8279510, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 12/21 1:19 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Modular Space Corporation. (Morgan, Pauline) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Wed 12/21 8:19 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (JohnstonJ, Julie) |