Resun Chippewa, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12825
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-12825
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12831 |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Resun Chippewa, LLC
1200 W Swedesford Rd
Berwyn, PA 19312-1172 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Final Decree
Wed 05/24 10:40 AM
Final Decree and Order Closing Certain Subsidiary Cases and Modifying Case Caption. Order Signed on 5/24/2017 (LMD) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 05/24 10:46 AM
Bankruptcy Case 16-12831 Closed (LMD) |
||
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Thu 12/22 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case consolidating the chapter 11 cases of Modular Space Intermediate Holdings, Inc.; Modular Space Corporation; Resun ModSpace, Inc.; ModSpace Government Financial Services, Inc.; ModSpace Financial Services Canada, Ltd.; and Resun Chippewa, LLC with the case of Modular Space Holdings, Inc. for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in the chapter 11 cases of Modular Space Holdings, Inc., Case No. 16-12825 (KJC), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 12/22/2016 (LMD) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 12/21 3:44 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-12831 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8279510, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
22
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 12/21 1:38 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Resun Chippewa, LLC. (Morgan, Pauline) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Wed 12/21 8:19 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (JohnstonJ, Julie) |