Northern Telecom Canada Limited
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:09-bk-10164
Lead case is: 1:09-bk-10164
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-12835 |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Debtor
Northern Telecom Canada Limited
, |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Foreign Representative
Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago |
Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 02/24 10:29 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (SH) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 02/06 2:52 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin Gross Terminated (SH) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
vCal
Minute Entry
Tue 01/03 11:40 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 12/29/2016 Subject: Joint Administration AND Joint Administration AND Joint Administration. (vCal Hearing ID (222941)). (SS) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2017 (SS) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Hearing - Notice
Thu 12/29 3:16 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Filing and Hearing on Petitions Seeking Recognition of Foreign Proceeding Pursuant to Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group. Hearing scheduled for 1/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/17/2017. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
10 | 10
order
Approve
Thu 12/29 2:44 PM
Order Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice Order Signed on 12/29/2016. (SH) |
|
9 | 9
order
Joint Administration Order
Thu 12/29 2:36 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Cases Under Chapter 15 of the Bankruptcy Code. An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 15 cases of Architel Systems Corporation, Case No. 16-12833 Nortel Communications Inc., Case No. 16-12834 and Northern Telecom Canada Limited, Case No. 16-12835 with all other cases jointly administered under Case No. 09-10164 (KG). The docket in Case No. 09-10164 KG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 12/29/2016. (SH) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Tue 12/27 9:18 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group. Hearing scheduled for 12/29/2016 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Approve - Motion
Wed 12/21 2:10 PM
Motion to Approve Motion for Order Specifying Form and Manner of Service of Notice Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Notice | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Wed 12/21 1:50 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 12/21 1:45 PM
Declaration in Support Declaration of Ken Coleman in Support of Verified Petitions for Recognition of Foreign Proceedings Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 12/21 1:19 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 12/21 1:14 PM
Declaration in Support Statement of Tom Ayres Under Section 1515(c) of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 12/21 12:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 16-12835 [misc,volpfp15] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8280345, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
misc
RETIRED - Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)
Wed 12/21 12:50 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Ernst & Young Inc., As Monitor and Foreign Representative of the Canadian Nortel Group, Northern Telecom Canada Limited. (Caloway, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Verified Petitions for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Related Relief | ||
Att: 2 Verification | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A- Proposed Order | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1-New Applicants Order | ||
court
Case Assigned
Wed 12/21 1:24 PM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case. (AK) |