Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Phillip J Shefferly
Case #: 2:16-bk-57000
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2016
Terminated:Jan 19, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Creative Catering of Wadhams, LLC
5078 Lapeer Road
Smiths Creek, MI 48074
Represented By
David R. Heyboer
Heyboer Law PLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Thursday, January 19, 2017
order Final Decree and Case Closed Thu 12:59 PM
Final Decree: The bankruptcy estate has been fully administered. The bankruptcy court has decreed the chapter 11 case is closed. (ADI: J Clark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
court Minute Entry. Case Dismissed Tue 4:42 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Not Held. Case Dismissed. Related [+] (clond)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Initial Ch. 11 Status Conference
Saturday, January 14, 2017
12 12 court Notice of Dismissal with BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal with BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 26. Notice Date 01/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Dismissing Case
Thursday, January 12, 2017
11 11 order Dismissing Case Thu 4:21 PM
Order Dismissing Case For Failure To File Documents: Schedule A/B Assets - Real and Personal Property, Schedule D Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property, Schedule E/F Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims, Schedule G Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Schedule H Codebtors, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy, and Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non Individuals as to Debtor . (kcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11:11 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession Creative Catering of Wadhams, LLC Related [+]. (Heyboer, David)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Initial Ch. 11 Status Conference
Saturday, December 24, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor In Possession Creative Catering of Wadhams, LLC
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 22. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thursday, December 22, 2016
7 7 order Initial Ch. 11 Status Conference Thu 3:01 PM
Order For Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 1/17/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (kcm)
Related: [-]
6 6 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business) Thu 1:38 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/17/2017 at 01:00 PM at room 315 E, 211 W. Fort St. Bldg. Detroit 341. Proofs of Claims due by 4/17/2017. (H, Laura)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 10:04 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Sysco Corporation (Sysco Entities). (Cotant, Julie)
Related: [-]
court Flags Set CASECHECKED Thu 3:37 PM
Flags Set CASECHECKED. (lcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 1:59 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Creative Catering of Wadhams, LLC. (Heyboer, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 1:59 PM
Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession Creative Catering of Wadhams, LLC. (Heyboer, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Wed 1:59 PM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Creative Catering of Wadhams, LLC. (Heyboer, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 1:58 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Creative Catering of Wadhams, LLC Application for Individuals to Pay the Filing Fee in Installments Due on 01/4/2017. Balance Sheet Due: 01/4/2017. Cash Flow Statement Due: 01/4/2017. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Due: 01/4/2017. Credit Counseling Certificate Due: 01/4/2017. Joint Debtor Credit Counseling Certification Due: 01/4/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtor(s) Schedules Due 01/4/2017. Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Debtor(s) without an Attorney due 01/4/2017. Schedule A/B due 01/4/2017. Schedule C - Debtor due 01/4/2017. Schedule C - Joint Debtor due 01/4/2017. Schedule D due 01/4/2017. Schedule E/F due 01/4/2017. Schedule G due 01/4/2017. Schedule H due 01/4/2017. Schedule I due 01/4/2017. Schedule J due 01/4/2017. Schedule J-2 due 01/4/2017. Schedules A-J due 01/4/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/4/2017. Statement of Operations Due: 01/4/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 01/4/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/4/2017. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) Due: 06/19/2017. (Heyboer, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 2:12 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-57000 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 28743154, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]