Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:16-cv-01440
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 21, 2016 3:09 PM CST
Defendant
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014
Plaintiff
Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.
600 Mountain Avenue
New Providence, NJ 07974
Represented By
Theodore Stevenson, III
Mckool Smith Pc - Dallas
contact info
Nicholas M Mathews
Mckool Smith Pc - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Nokia Technologies Oy
Represented By
Theodore Stevenson, III
Mckool Smith Pc - Dallas
contact info
Nicholas M Mathews
Mckool Smith Pc - Dallas
contact info


1. Nokia sues Apple for patent infringement in the U.S. and Germany (venturebeat.com)
Submitted Wed 12/21/2016
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM CST
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
12 12 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 3:46 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
11 11 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 3:29 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 3:43 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 2/13/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 3:47 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 2/28/2017. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Roddy Pace on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Nokia Technologies Oy (Pace, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Alan Kamprath on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Nokia Technologies Oy (Kamprath, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nokia Technologies Oy, Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 12/22/2016, answer due 1/12/2017. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 4:32 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 2:48 PM
***PLEASE DISREGARD*** ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/21/2016. (nkl, ) Modified on 12/21/2016 (ch, )
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M Mathews on behalf of Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Nokia Technologies Oy (Mathews, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 2:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Nokia Technologies Oy identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation for Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc., Nokia Technologies Oy. (Stevenson, Theodore)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 1:45 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Stevenson, Theodore)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 12:02 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document:1 Complaint..(Stevenson, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6081676.), filed by Nokia Technologies OY, Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 2:46 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 2:48 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (nkl, )
Related: [-]