Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 3:16-cv-00201
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Dec 22, 2016 2:51 AM EST
Defendant
Daniel Elliot
Defendant
Joshua Sepanski
Defendant
Samuel Smith
Plaintiff
Kevin Sherman
Represented By
Larry Christopher Stewart
Stewart, Seay & Felton, LLC
contact info
Eugene Felton, Jr.
Stewart, Seay & Felton, LLC
contact info
George Brian Spears
Law Office Of Brian Spears
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Sherman
Represented By
Larry Christopher Stewart
Stewart, Seay & Felton, LLC
contact info
Eugene Felton, Jr.
Stewart, Seay & Felton, LLC
contact info
George Brian Spears
Law Office Of Brian Spears
contact info

Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM EST
Thursday, January 19, 2017
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 3:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Elliot. Daniel Elliot waiver mailed on 1/18/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (Mitchell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
8 8 misc Leave of Absence Tue 2:40 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 4/14-4/24/2017, by George Brian Spears. (Spears, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Mitchell on behalf of Daniel Elliot (Mitchell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Carothers on behalf of Daniel Elliot (Carothers, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey Scott Gray on behalf of Joshua Sepanski, Samuel Smith (Gray, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samuel Smith. Samuel Smith waiver mailed on 12/22/2016, answer due 2/21/2017. (Gray, Harvey)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua Sepanski. Joshua Sepanski waiver mailed on 12/22/2016, answer due 2/21/2017. (Gray, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 4:01 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Daniel Elliot and(rsh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Sepanski,
Att: 2 Summons - Smith
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kevin Sherman, Mary Sherman. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6878875.(rsh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet