The Office Partners, LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Martin R Barash |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-13593 |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2017 |
Debtor
The Office Partners, LLC
39440 Laurel Canyon Blvd., Ste. 459
Studio City, CA 91604 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Nancy J Zamora (TR)
U.S. Bank Tower 633 West 5th Street, Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 12/22/2016 12:02 AM PST |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 12/21 4:08 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(1:16-bk-13593) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43918797. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Wed 12/21 4:08 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/20/2017 at 09:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. (Berger, Michael) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 12/21 4:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by The Office Partners, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/4/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/4/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/4/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/4/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/4/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/4/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/4/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/4/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/4/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/4/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/4/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/4/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/4/2017. (Berger, Michael) |