Bingo Innovations of California, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Mark D Houle |
Case #: | 6:16-bk-21112 |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Debtor
Bingo Innovations of California, Inc.
7211 Haven Ave # E264
Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91701-6064 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Charles W Daff (TR)
2107 N. Broadway Suite 308
Santa Ana, CA 92706 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501 |
Docket last updated: 12/22/2016 12:02 PM PST |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 12/22 10:33 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:16-bk-21112) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43923226. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Thu 12/22 10:36 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/26/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. (Steingraber, Stuart) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 12/22 10:32 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Bingo Innovations of California, Inc. (Steingraber, Stuart) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Thu 12/22 10:42 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) w/holographic signatures Filed by Debtor Bingo Innovations of California, Inc.. (Steingraber, Stuart) |