California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine E Bauer
Case #: 8:16-bk-15171
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company
3991 MacArthur Blvd Ste 125
Newport Beach, CA 92660-3049
Represented By
Marc C Forsythe
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701
Represented By
Michael J Hauser
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Friday, January 20, 2017
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 01/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
29 29 notice Notice of motion/application Fri 2:48 PM
Notice of motion/application with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 28 Application to Employ Marc C. Forsythe and Goe & Forsythe, LLP as Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company
28 28 motion Employ (motion) Fri 2:47 PM
Application to Employ Marc C. Forsythe and Goe & Forsythe, LLP as Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
27 27 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion) Thu 11:27 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
26 26 misc Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Wed 4:38 PM
Notice to creditors re: notice of hearing on U.S. Trustee's motion to dismiss or convert case to one under Chapter 7 pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) (BNC-PDF) (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-]
25 25 court Hearing Set(Motion) Wed 3:51 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] 24 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
24 24 motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Wed 12:36 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case to One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); and Request for Judgment for Quarterly Fees Due and Payable to the U.S. Trustee at the Time of Hearing Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Hauser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 9:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF)
21 21 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 3:35 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Donald W Fitzgerald Filed by Creditor RS Lending, Inc.. (Fitzgerald, Donald)
Related: [-]
20 20 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 2:29 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Fitzgerald, Donald. (Fitzgerald, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
23 23 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 12:13 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
19 19 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF) Tue 12:39 PM
Order granting ex-parte motion to extend time to file schedules, statement of financial affairs, and balance of deficiency documents - Extended to January 19, 2017. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/10/2017. (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] 18]
18 18 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion) Tue 8:43 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
17 17 misc Statement Mon 3:55 PM
Statement Genesis Capital's Reservation of Rights, Request for Order to Show Cause and Response to Debtor's Scheduling and Case Management Report Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC. (Dulberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
16 16 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 1:23 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Banner, Keith. (Banner, Keith)
Related: [-]
15 15 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 1:20 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Davidoff, Brian. (Davidoff, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
14 14 misc Status report Wed 4:02 PM
Status report with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, December 29, 2016
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 9:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/29/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Thu 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 08. Receipt Number 80067782. (admin)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Thu 9:30 PM
Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $5.00 by 08. Receipt Number 80067782. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
12 12 misc Request for special notice Wed 3:37 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC. (Dulberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 3:31 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Dulberg, Jeffrey. (Dulberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
10 10 notice Notice Tue 12:40 PM
Notice of Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference with proof of service - REFILED TO CORRECT TYPO IN CAPTION Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference with proof of service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company (RE: related document(s)7 Order setting scheduling and case management conference - Status Conference set for January 11, 2017 @ 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 12/27/2016).
9 9 notice Notice Tue 12:37 PM
Notice of Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference with proof of service Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 7 Order setting scheduling and case management conference - Status Conference set for January 11, 2017 @ 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 12/27/2016
8 8 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 11:13 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company
7 7 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 11:12 AM
Order setting scheduling and case management conference - Status Conference set for January 11, 2017 @ 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/27/2016 (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] doc
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 9:31 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 08. Receipt Number 80067763. (admin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 25, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/25/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/25/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 12/25/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Friday, December 23, 2016
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Fri 10:21 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/3/2017 at 11:00 AM at RM 1-159, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Beezer, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Thu 3:52 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 3:47 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by 1550 Blue Jay Way, LLC, a Delaware, Limited Liability Company List of Equity Security Holders due 01/5/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/5/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/5/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/5/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/5/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/5/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/5/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/5/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/5/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 01/5/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 01/5/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/5/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/5/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/5/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/5/2017. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 3:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:16-bk-15171) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43927281. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Thu 4:48 PM
Judge Catherine E. Bauer added to case, affiliated to lead case 8:16-bk-15156-CB - 779 Stradella, LLC. Involvement of Judge Mark S Wallace Terminated (Corona, Heidi)
Related: [-]