Flocar Investment Group
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-26856 |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Debtor
Flocar Investment Group
999 Brickell Ave Ste 500
Miami, FL 33131-3041 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Marcia T Dunn
555 NE 15 St, Ste 934-A
Miami, FL 33132 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 12/23/2016 12:02 AM EST |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Thu 12/22 6:44 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-26856 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28924217. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Thu 12/22 6:41 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Rubin, David) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Thu 12/22 6:41 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 01/25/2017 at 01:30 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 102, Miami. Proofs of Claim due by 04/25/2017. (Rubin, David) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 12/22 6:42 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Flocar Investment Group. (Rubin, David) |