Matthews et al v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-17731 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 20, 2017 4:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Emily Barre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Chetta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Matthews
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 2:20 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 01/02 1:50 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re5 Amended Short Form Complaint as to Debra Chetta filed pursuant to Order issued in Master Case. However, the filing attorney must sever this civil action pursuant to the Order of Severance. No further action taken by the Clerk. If assistance is needed, please contact (504) 589-7715. (cbs) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/02 1:43 PM
AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by Debra Chetta per Order in Master Case, Rec. Doc. No. 1319.(cbs) |
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 01/24 8:44 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 12/30 4:25 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (am) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Thu 12/22 2:53 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. L.L.C. (Moore, Douglas) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 12/22 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 16-12043 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5870629) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. L.L.C..Attorney Douglas J. Moore added to party Sanofi-Aventis U.S. L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Moore, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |