Walborn v. Healthcare Collections-I LLC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04501 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 19, 2017 1:16 AM MST |
Defendant
Healthcare Collections-I LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victoria Walborn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/07 5:42 PM
ORDER granting the19 Stipulation and dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/7/2017. (LFIG) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/07 1:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Healthcare Collections-I LLC.(Lamb, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/30 11:42 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Compel Written Discovery Responses and for an Award of Expenses by Healthcare Collections-I LLC.(Lamb, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant Leave to File a Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to the Outstanding Discovery and Awarding Defendant its Expenses, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Motion to Compel | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 06/16 9:47 AM
ORDER:15 Motion to Compel Written Discovery Responses and an Award of Expenses is stricken. The parties must comply with the Court's discovery dispute procedure. See order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/16/2017.(LMR) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Notice of Errata
Thu 06/15 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Errata re:15 MOTION to Compel Written Discovery Responses and for an Award of Expenses by Defendant Healthcare Collections-I LLC..(Lamb, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Comel | ||
15 | 15
motion
Compel
Thu 06/15 1:35 PM
MOTION to Compel Written Discovery Responses and for an Award of Expenses by Healthcare Collections-I LLC.(Lamb, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 04/03 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Healthcare Collections-I LLC. (Lamb, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/15 3:05 PM
NOTICE re: of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosure Statement by Healthcare Collections-I LLC . (Lamb, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Tue 03/07 8:43 AM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/4/2017. Dispositive motions due by 12/28/2017. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2017. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/6/2017. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Mon 03/06 7:11 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Victoria Walborn. (Cutler, Avraham) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 01/23 5:01 PM
ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/15/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/23/2017. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/17 10:41 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Healthcare Collections-I LLC.(Lamb, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Service Executed
Tue 01/10 7:50 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Victoria Walborn: Return of Service for Healthcare Collection-I, LLC . (Cutler, Avraham) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/23 8:14 AM
Summons Issued as to Healthcare Collections-I LLC. (BAS) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 12/22 2:25 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Victoria Walborn. (Cutler, Avraham) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 12/22 1:00 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint, 2 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Victoria Walborn. (Cutler, Avraham) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Thu 12/22 1:00 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/22/2016. (LFIG) |
|
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 12/22 12:06 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13739417. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 16-04501 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (LAD) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)
Thu 12/22 12:04 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Victoria Walborn. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. Please submit using the event, "Additional Attachments to Main Document," found under Other Filings, Other Documents. This event will allow you to link to the Complaint. The Automated Civil Cover Sheet form may be found on our website. It is not necessary to re-file the Complaint itself. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/22 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13739417 filed by Victoria Walborn. (Submitted by Avraham Cutler) (LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |