JLW Subway 32883, LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Sheri Bluebond |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-26722 |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Debtor
JLW Subway 32883, LLC
728 W Avenue J
Lancaster, CA 93534-3425 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
David A Gill (TR)
Danning, Gill, Diamond & Kollitz 1900 Avenue of the Stars, 11th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 12/23/2016 12:02 AM PST |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Thu 12/22 4:09 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/25/2017 at 11:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Lozano, David) |
||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 12/22 4:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-26722) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43927571. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 12/22 3:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by JLW Subway 32883, LLC (Lozano, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Thu 12/22 3:54 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor JLW Subway 32883, LLC. (Lozano, David) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Thu 12/22 3:58 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor JLW Subway 32883, LLC. (Lozano, David) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 12/22 4:00 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor JLW Subway 32883, LLC. (Lozano, David) |