California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:16-bk-26727
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 27, 2017

Debtor
Bjewel, Inc.
706 E 32nd St
Los Angeles, CA 90011-2406
Represented By
Young K Chang
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Elissa Miller (TR)
SulmeyerKupetz 333 S Hope St 35th fl
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 12/23/2016 12:02 AM PST
Thursday, December 22, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 5:18 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-26727) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43928256. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Thu 5:18 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/27/2017 at 11:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 5:03 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Bjewel, Inc. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Thu 5:03 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Bjewel, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Thu 5:27 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Bjewel, Inc.. (Chang, Young)
Related: [-]