Ebneter Investment Corporation
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-31366 |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 09, 2018 |
Debtor
Ebneter Investment Corporation
134 Elm St Apt 101
San Mateo, CA 94401-2753 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
E. Lynn Schoenmann
35 Miller Ave. #298
Mill Valley, CA 94941 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 12/23/2016 12:02 PM PST |
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/23 11:59 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-31366 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt number 27047267, amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Fri 12/23 12:00 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/31/2017 at 10:00 AM at Office of the U.S. Trustee Office 450. (Greene, Charles) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 12/23 11:58 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $335. Filed by Ebneter Investment Corporation. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 01/6/2017. (Greene, Charles) |