Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jerry A Brown
Case #: 2:16-bk-13124
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Jan 19, 2017

Debtor
Chappapeela Development Corporation
1411B Valence St
New Orleans, LA 70115-4005
Represented By
Sharry I Sandler
The Law Office Of Sharry I. Sandler
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Wilbur J. (Bill) Babin, Jr.
3027 Ridgelake Drive
Metairie, LA 70002
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130


Docket last updated: 12/24/2016 12:03 AM CST
Friday, December 23, 2016
crditcrd none Fri 3:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 16-13124 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 5737370, amount $ 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 Fri 8:20 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Wilbur J. (Bill) Babin, Jr. with 341(a)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Fri 3:13 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Chappapeela Development Corporation. Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing due by 12/30/2016. (Sandler, Sharry)
Related: [-]