Oneida Seven Generations Corporation et al v. City of Green Bay
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-01700 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 21, 2017 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Green Bay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oneida Seven Generations Corporation
|
Represented By
|
1. | City of Green Bay to pay $2.5M in waste-to-energy plant federal lawsuit settlement (wbay.com) |
Submitted Mon 02/12/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
misc
Exhibits Destroyed
Wed 11/14 1:46 PM
EXHIBITS destroyed. No response to notification received. (cav) |
||
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Notification of Exhibit Release
Wed 10/24 3:09 PM
NOTIFICATION of Exhibit Release sent to counsel of record. (cav) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 03/28 10:45 AM
USCA Mandate (certified copy) as to21 Notice of Appeal filed by Oneida Seven Generations Corporation, Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC; USCA Number 17-2341 The appeal is dismissed. No record to be returned.(mac) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Final Order | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Prepared
Mon 07/10 2:06 PM
Appeal Record Prepared re21 Notice of Appeal (lh) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 06/30 3:33 PM
USCA Case Number 17-2341 re:21 Notice of Appeal filed by Oneida Seven Generations Corporation, Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC. (tlf) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 06/29 2:54 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re21 Notice of Appeal (lh) |
|
24 | 24
appeal
Attorney Cover Letter
Thu 06/29 2:52 PM
Attorney Cover Letter re:21 Notice of Appeal (lh) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/29 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Apfeld on behalf of Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC, Oneida Seven Generations Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael B. Apfeld (Apfeld, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
Docketing Statement
Wed 06/28 2:46 PM
Docketing Statement by Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC, Oneida Seven Generations Corporation re21 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) (Apfeld, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 06/28 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to19 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC, Oneida Seven Generations Corporation. Filing Fee PAID $505, receipt number 0757-2610893 (cc: all counsel) (Apfeld, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Tue 06/06 10:05 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 06/06/2017. (cc: all counsel)(cav) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 06/06 10:00 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/14 11:11 AM
DECLARATION of Gregg J. Gunta in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Capacity to Sue(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Gunta Declaration Exhibit 11 - Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Oneida Seven Generations Corporation et al v. City of Green Bay, Case No. 12CV2262 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Tue 03/14 11:04 AM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by City of Green Bay re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint .(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Holmes v. City of Racine, No. 14-CV-208 (E.D. Wis. July 30, 2014), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Shipyard Development, LLC v. City of Sturgeon Bay, No. 09-C-216 (E.D. Wis. Feb. 24, 2011), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Peninsula Properties, Inc. v. City of Sturgeon Bay, No. 04-C-692 (E.D. Wis. May 8, 2006), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Donohoo v. Hanson, No. 14-CV-309 (W.D. Wis. Sept. 3, 2015), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Unpublished Case - CEnergy-Glenmore Wind Farm no. 1, LLC v. Town of Glenmore, No. 12-C-1166 (E.D. Wis. July 3, 2013) | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit
Tue 02/28 2:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Amber C. Coisman regarding 14 .(Wilson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Opinion - Europaper B.V. v. Integrated Material Management Serv., Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Unpublished Opinion - Peninsula Props., Inc. v. City of Sturgeon Bay, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Unpublished Opinion - CEnergy-Glenmore Wind Farm #1, LLC v. Town of Glenmore, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Unpublished Opinion - Donohoo v. Hanson, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Unpublished Opinion - Ecotone Farm, LLC v. Ward, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Unpublished Opinion - Three Legged Monkey LP v. City of El Paso, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Unpublished Opinion - Sloup v. Loeffler | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit
Tue 02/28 2:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Lisa Summers regarding 14 .(Wilson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Business Committee Resolution No. 02-22-17_E | ||
14 | 14
respm
Brief in Opposition to Motion
Tue 02/28 1:58 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC, Oneida Seven Generations Corporation re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Wilson, Eric) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Thu 02/09 1:24 PM
LETTER from Attorney Gregg Gunta re12 Declaration of Leah Sue Dodge. Hard copy of CD containing Exhibits 9 and 10 received and sent to Chambers. (mac) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Declaration
Tue 02/07 2:32 PM
DECLARATION of Leah Sue Dodge in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Capacity to Sue(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Dodge Exhibit 6 - Memorandum dated December 15, 2013, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Dodge Exhibit 7 - Corporate Charter of Oneida Seven Generations Corporation, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Dodge Exhibit 8 - Special General Tribal Council Meeting Action Report | ||
11 | 11
misc
Declaration
Tue 02/07 2:27 PM
DECLARATION of Gregg J. Gunta in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Lack of Capacity to Sue(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Gunta Exhibit 2 - Corporate Charter of Oneida Seven Generations Corporation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Gunta Exhibit 3 - BC Resolution 12-24-13-A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Gunta Exhibit 4 - BC Resolution 05-27-15-B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Gunta Exhibit 5 - Robert's Rules of Order | ||
10 | 10
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Tue 02/07 2:22 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by City of Green Bay re9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint .(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibit 1 - Constitution and By-Laws of The Oneida Nation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Unpublished Case - ACF Leasing v. Oneida Seven Generations Corp., No. 1 14-3443 (Ill. Ct. App. Oct. 13, 2015), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Donohoo v. Hanson, No. 14-cv-309 (W.D. Wis. Sept. 3, 2015), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Donohoo v. Hanson, No. 16-2405 (7th Cir. Oct. 28 (2016)) | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Tue 02/07 2:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Green Bay. (Gunta, Gregg) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/07 2:14 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by City of Green Bay.(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/13 5:29 PM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Wilson, Eric) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
order
Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 01/12 9:14 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to February 8, 2017 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by City of Green Bay, filed by the City of Green Bay. signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 01/12/2017. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 01/11 3:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by City of Green Bay.(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/11 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg J Gunta on behalf of City of Green Bay. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth, John A. Wolfgang(Gunta, Gregg) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 01/09 11:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oneida Seven Generations Corporation, Green Bay Renewable Energy LLC. City of Green Bay served on 1/4/2017, answer due 1/25/2017. (Coisman, Amber) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 12/23 9:33 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Green Bay Renewable Energy, LLC. (Coisman, Amber) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Fri 12/23 9:32 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Oneida Seven Generations Corporation. (Coisman, Amber) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/23 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against City of Green Bay by Oneida Seven Generations Corporation, Green Bay Renewable Energy, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2488138)(Coisman, Amber) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit WI Court of Appeals Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit WI Supreme Court Decision, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 12/23 9:49 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/23 11:45 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Green Bay. (mac) |