Martin v. HEAGGAN-BROWN et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01702 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 21, 2017 4:24 AM CDT |
Defendant
ABC Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
City of Milwaukee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Hauser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dominique Heaggan-Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Martin
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal lawsuit filed against Milwaukee police officers for conducting an illegal strip search (tmj4.com) |
Submitted Tue 12/27/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 03/19 2:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Telephone Conference held on 3/19/19. The parties have been discussing settlement and will notify the court if they reach an agreement. Plaintiff does not intend to pursue a state law battery claim at trial. The only cause of action for trial is the Sec. 1983 Excessive Force / Failure to Intervene claim. (jad) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 03/19 3:35 PM
Docket Annotation - The parties have notified the court that they have reached a settlement in principle. Therefore this case will be terminated for administrative purposes only pending receipt of a stipulation of dismissal. (jad) |
||
Monday, March 18, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 03/19 8:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Telephone Conference held on 3/18/19. The claims on which plaintiff will proceed to trial have been narrowed to a Sec 1983 Excessive Force claim and a battery claim under state law. Though focus of claims is tasing, evidence of strip search is admissible. See minutes for further ruled motions in limine. Telephonic status conference set for 3/19/19 at 11:15 a.m. (jad) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 03/18 10:49 AM
Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/18/19 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lynn Adelman. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel will call the court at 414-297-1285 to provide a contact number, (jad) |
||
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Writ
Wed 02/20 3:09 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/20/19 granting39 Motion for Writ. (cc: all counsel) (jad) |
||
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
trial
Pretrial Report
Fri 02/15 9:40 PM
Joint PRETRIAL REPORT by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown.(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit List Ex. A | ||
39 | 39
motion
Writ
Fri 02/15 4:25 PM
MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown. (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/13 4:36 PM
STIPULATION To File Pretrial Report by Ronnie Martin. (Manion, Shauna) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 02/07 4:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 2/7/19. Parties discussed schedule for final pretrial and trial. Trial anticipated to take 1-2 days. Pretrial set for 2/20/19 at 1:30 p.m. Trial reset for 3/21/19 at 8:30 a.m. Court grants defendants uncontested motions in limine. Remaining contested motions in limine to be argued and decided at final pretrial. Parties discussed possibility of settlement. See attached minutes for details. (jad) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/06 3:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/6/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on 2/7/19 at 10:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. Counsel must call the court prior to the call at 414-297-1285 to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(jad) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 01/31 10:14 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/20/19 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 390, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge Lynn Adelman. (jad) |
||
order
Text Only Order
Thu 01/31 1:41 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/31/19 GRANTING joint stipulation to adjourn final pretrial35 . (cc: all counsel)(jad) |
||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/30 8:02 PM
STIPULATION to Adjourn Final Pretrial Conference by Ronnie Martin. (Manion, Shauna) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/25 12:03 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/25/19 granting extension of time for filing final pretrial reports to 1/31/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/24 4:00 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Filing Final Pretrial Reports by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown.(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment | ||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Tue 01/22 6:40 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Ronnie Martin re25 MOTION in Limine . (Manion, Shauna) |
|
31 | 31
respm
Reply Brief in Support of Motion
Tue 01/22 3:21 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown re26 MOTION in Limine . (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 01/14 8:19 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ronnie Martin re26 MOTION in Limine . (Manion, Shauna) |
|
29 | 29
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 01/14 3:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown re25 MOTION in Limine Response Brief to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine . (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Declaration
Fri 01/04 7:09 PM
DECLARATION of Naomi E. Gehling in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Unpublished case - Beckham v. Stiles, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Unpublished case - Martinez v. City of Chicago, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Unpublished case - Caldwell v. City of Chicago | ||
27 | 27
respm
Brief in Support of Motion
Fri 01/04 7:05 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown re26 MOTION in Limine . (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
26 | 26
motion
In Limine
Fri 01/04 7:03 PM
MOTION in Limine by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown. (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
25 | 25
motion
In Limine
Fri 01/04 6:49 PM
MOTION in Limine by Ronnie Martin. (Manion, Shauna) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/14 4:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER for Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/14/18 by Judge Lynn Adelman. IT IS ORDERED that any motions in limine are due by 1/4/19; responses due 10 days later; and replies are due 1 week after the responses. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that a Final Pretrial will be held on 2/4/19 at 11:00 AM and a Jury Trial will commence on 2/25/19 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 390. (kwb) |
|
Saturday, July 28, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/30 9:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/28/18. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on 8/14/18 at 11:30 a.m. The court will initiate the call. Counsel must call the court prior to the call at 414-297-1285 to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(jad) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/01 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elleny B Christopoulos on behalf of City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown. Attorney(s) appearing: Elleny B. Christopoulos (Christopoulos, Elleny) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Tue 04/17 5:02 PM
LETTER from Plaintiff regarding Objection to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time . (Manion, Shauna) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 04/17 3:40 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 04/17/18. IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion to modify the scheduling order19 is GRANTED in part and the scheduling order is modified as follows: the parties shall complete discovery on or before 6/19/18, and file any dispositive motions on or before 7/19/18, subject to additional schedule modifications, as appropriate. (cc: all counsel) (Dreckmann, Julie) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 04/16 2:29 PM
Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown.(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment | ||
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/12 11:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion to modify the scheduling order15 is GRANTED and the scheduling order is modified as follows: the parties shall complete discovery on or before April 20, 2018, and file any dispositive motions on or before May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 04/12/2018. (cc: all counsel)(lls) |
|
order
~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 04/12 11:38 AM
Motions terminated:15 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Dominique Heaggan-Brown, Peter Hauser, City of Milwaukee. signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 04/12/2018. (cc: all counsel)(lls) |
||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/05 4:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ronnie Martin re15 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time . (Manion, Shauna) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Declaration
Mon 02/26 1:21 PM
DECLARATION of Naomi E. Gehling in Support of Defendants' Civil L. R. 7(h) Motion For Extension of Time(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 02/26 1:19 PM
Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown. (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
order
Text Only Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 01/11 1:36 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting14 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/16/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/11/2018. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/10 4:20 PM
STIPULATION to Modify Scheduling Order by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown. (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 05/12 11:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/12/17. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/25/2017; Deadline to join additional parties and Amended Pleadings is 5/25/2017; Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 7/28/2017; Defendants Expert Witness List due by 9/29/2017; Discovery due by 11/30/2017; Dispositive Motions due by 12/22/2017. See order. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 05/12 8:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/11/2017; The court will adopt the parties' proposed schedule in a separate order. (bx) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Mon 05/08 3:37 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown. (Gehling, Naomi) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 05/08 11:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/8/17 that the parties file their Rule 26(f) report with the court no later than May 10, 2017 . (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 04/04 4:54 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/4/17. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2017 11:45 AM in by telephone before Judge Lynn Adelman. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and the telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(gc) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/29 11:26 AM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Milwaukee, Dominique Heaggan-Brown.(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/29 11:06 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Peter Hauser.(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/08 4:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by City of Milwaukee, Dominique Heaggan-Brown.(Gehling, Naomi) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/13 8:45 AM
Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Ronnie Martin. (Manion, Shauna) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/10 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to City of Milwaukee, Peter Hauser, Dominique Heaggan-Brown. (jcl) |
||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 02/09 1:35 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Ronnie Martin. (Manion, Shauna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 02/09 1:26 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Ronnie Martin(Manion, Shauna) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
misc
Case Opening Modification
Tue 12/27 11:09 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (Names should not be in all caps, do not enter address) - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (bx) |
||
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Tue 12/27 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re1 Complaint filed by Ronnie Martin ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx) |
||
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/23 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna D Manion on behalf of Ronnie Martin. Attorney(s) appearing: Brent D. Nistler (Manion, Shauna) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/23 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Ronnie Martin. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2488637)(Manion, Shauna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Notice of Claim, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 12/27 8:45 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (bx) |