California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erithe A Smith
Case #: 8:16-bk-15183
Case Filed:Dec 24, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Feb 06, 2017

Debtor
Newport Pizza, Inc.
PO Box 15688
Irvine, CA 92623-5688
Represented By
Thomas J Polis
Polis & Associates, Aplc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas H Casey (TR)
22342 Avenida Empresa, Suite 200
Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 12/27/2016 11:18 PM PST
Saturday, December 24, 2016
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sat 10:33 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8:16-bk-15183) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43934500. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Sat 10:58 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Polis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sat 10:32 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Newport Pizza, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/9/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/9/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/9/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/9/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/9/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/9/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/9/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/9/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/9/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 01/9/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/9/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/9/2017. (Polis, Thomas) WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket #3 AND #4. 72 HOUR DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SET: Debtor's physical street address must be provided in addition to any post office box address. CASE ALSO DEFICIENT FOR: Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 1/9/2017, Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 1/9/2017, Summary of Assets, Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/9/2017 and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 1/9/2017. DEADLINES TERMINATED: Declaration RE Income and Declaration RE Schedule. Modified on 12/27/2016 (Law, Tamika)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Sat 10:32 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Newport Pizza, Inc.. (Polis, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Sat 10:58 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/06/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Polis, Thomas)
Related: [-]